EP0618819 - CATHETER WITH ATRAUMATIC DRUG DELIVERY TIP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.09.2000 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TARGET THERAPEUTICS, INC. 47900 Bayside Parkway Fremont, CA 94538 / US | [1999/27] |
Former [1994/41] | For all designated states TARGET THERAPEUTICS, INC. 47201 Lakeview Boulevard, P.O. Box 5120 Fremont, CA 94537-5120 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEE, U., Hiram 127 Dolton Avenue San Carlos, CA 94030 / US | 02 /
LEMOURE, Edward, R. 67 Howard Avenue New Haven, CT 06519 / US | [1994/41] | Representative(s) | Price, Nigel John King J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/41] | Price, Nigel John King J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 93921670.1 | 17.09.1993 | [1994/41] | WO1993US08834 | Priority number, date | US19920954669 | 30.09.1992 Original published format: US 954669 | [1994/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9407549 | Date: | 14.04.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0618819 | Date: | 12.10.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.04.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0618819 | Date: | 01.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.04.1994 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.03.1995 | Classification | IPC: | A61M25/00 | [1995/11] | CPC: |
A61M25/007 (EP,US);
A61M25/0054 (EP,US);
A61M2025/0079 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1994/41] | A61M5/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1994/41] | Title | German: | KATHETER MIT ATRAUMATISCHER SPITZE ZUR VERABREICHUNG VON ARZNEIEN | [1994/41] | English: | CATHETER WITH ATRAUMATIC DRUG DELIVERY TIP | [1994/41] | French: | CATHETER A POINTE DE LIBERATION ATRAUMATIQUE DE MEDICAMENT | [1994/41] | Entry into regional phase | 11.04.1994 | National basic fee paid | 11.04.1994 | Search fee paid | 11.04.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.04.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.04.1994 | Examination requested [1994/41] | 25.02.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.08.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.04.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.04.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.07.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 08.07.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.09.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.12.1999 | BE | 01.12.1999 | CH | 01.12.1999 | ES | 01.12.1999 | GR | 01.12.1999 | IT | 01.12.1999 | LI | 01.12.1999 | SE | 01.12.1999 | PT | 02.03.2000 | [2008/05] |
Former [2004/07] | AT | 01.12.1999 | |
BE | 01.12.1999 | ||
CH | 01.12.1999 | ||
ES | 01.12.1999 | ||
GR | 01.12.1999 | ||
LI | 01.12.1999 | ||
SE | 01.12.1999 | ||
PT | 02.03.2000 | ||
Former [2002/26] | AT | 01.12.1999 | |
BE | 01.12.1999 | ||
CH | 01.12.1999 | ||
ES | 01.12.1999 | ||
LI | 01.12.1999 | ||
SE | 01.12.1999 | ||
PT | 02.03.2000 | ||
Former [2002/23] | AT | 01.12.1999 | |
BE | 01.12.1999 | ||
CH | 01.12.1999 | ||
LI | 01.12.1999 | ||
SE | 01.12.1999 | ||
PT | 02.03.2000 | ||
Former [2000/52] | AT | 01.12.1999 | |
BE | 01.12.1999 | ||
CH | 01.12.1999 | ||
LI | 01.12.1999 | ||
PT | 02.03.2000 | ||
Former [2000/51] | AT | 01.12.1999 | |
BE | 01.12.1999 | ||
PT | 02.03.2000 | ||
CH | 07.03.2000 | ||
LI | 07.03.2000 | ||
Former [2000/50] | BE | 01.12.1999 | |
PT | 02.03.2000 | ||
CH | 07.03.2000 | ||
LI | 07.03.2000 | ||
Former [2000/43] | BE | 01.12.1999 | |
PT | 02.03.2000 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4173981 (MORTENSEN J D [US]) [X] 1-17 * column 5, line 52 - column 6, line 54; figure - *; | [A]DE3314755 (MEDIZIN TECH WERKSTAETTE ARZT [DE]) [A] 1-17 * page 10, line 1 - line 5; figure - *; | [A]GB2182567 (SMITHS INDUSTRIES PLC) [A] 1-17 * page 2, line 50 - line 54; figure - *; | [A]EP0476796 (E Z EM INC [US], et al) [A] 1-17* column 5, line 20 - line 49; figure - * | International search | [Y]US4149535 (VOLDER JOY G R); | [Y]US4391276 (LAZARUS HARRISON [US], et al); | [A]US4808158 (KREUZER RUDOLF [DE], et al); | [Y]US4842590 (TANABE SUSUMU [JP], et al); | [Y]US4848344 (SOS THOMAS A [US], et al); | [YP]US5158084 (GHIATAS ABRAHAM A [US]) |