EP0633863 - DEVICE FOR CONVEYING THICK SUBSTANCES CONTAINING A GREAT DEAL OF SOLID MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.10.1996 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.11.1996 [1996/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Putzmeister-Werk Maschinenfabrik GmbH Max-Eyth-Strasse 10 Postfach 2152 72629 Aichtal / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/03] | For all designated states Putzmeister-Werk Maschinenfabrik GmbH Max-Eyth-Strasse 10 Postfach 2152 D-72629 Aichtal / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHLECHT, Karl In den Staudenäckern 6 D-7024 Filderstadt 4 / DE | 02 /
SCHUSTER, Ulrich Sonnenbergstrasse 109 D-7000 Stuttgart 1 / DE | 03 /
ROCKSTROH, Axel Am Schönblick 34 D-7432 Bad Urach / DE | [1995/03] | Representative(s) | Wolf, Eckhard, et al Pfiz/Gauss Patentanwälte PartmbB Tübinger Strasse 26 70178 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/03] | Wolf, Eckhard, Dr.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Wolf & Lutz Hauptmannsreute 93 D-70193 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 93921731.1 | 04.02.1993 | [1995/03] | WO1993EP00251 | Priority number, date | DE19924211138 | 03.04.1992 Original published format: DE 4211138 | [1995/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9320002 | Date: | 14.10.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0633863 | Date: | 18.01.1995 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.10.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0633863 | Date: | 06.12.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.10.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B65G53/30, B65G53/52, F17D1/16 | [1995/03] | CPC: |
F16L23/04 (EP,US);
B65G53/523 (EP,US);
B65G53/58 (EP,US);
F16L57/00 (EP,US);
F17D1/088 (EP,US);
F17D1/16 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1995/03] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR FÖRDERUNG VON FESTSTOFFREICHEN DICKSTOFFEN | [1995/03] | English: | DEVICE FOR CONVEYING THICK SUBSTANCES CONTAINING A GREAT DEAL OF SOLID MATERIAL | [1995/03] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR LE TRANSPORT DE MATIERES CONSISTANTES A FORTE TENEUR EN MATIERES SOLIDES | [1995/03] | Entry into regional phase | 02.08.1994 | National basic fee paid | 02.08.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.08.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.10.1993 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.08.1994 | Examination requested [1995/03] | 16.03.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.06.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.06.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 29.06.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.09.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]GB556707 (DOUGLAS WHITAKER); | [A]DE1001186 (MANNESMANN AG); | [A]US3892252 (POETTMANN FRED H) |