EP0665872 - PROCESS AND ARRANGEMENT FOR SCRUBBING FUEL GAS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.04.1997 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.04.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.06.1997 [1997/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/32] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAUMGÄRTEL, Gerd Bergstrasse 33 D-91341 Röttenbach / DE | 02 /
TRATZ, Herbert Scheerstrasse 3 D-91242 Ottensoos / DE | [1995/32] | Application number, filing date | 93921810.3 | 11.10.1993 | [1995/32] | WO1993DE00959 | Priority number, date | DE19924235894 | 23.10.1992 Original published format: DE 4235894 | [1995/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9410266 | Date: | 11.05.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0665872 | Date: | 09.08.1995 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.05.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0665872 | Date: | 12.06.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.05.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C10K1/02, C10K1/16, B01D53/14 | [1995/32] | CPC: |
C10K1/08 (EP);
C10K1/02 (KR);
B01D53/14 (KR);
C10K1/06 (EP);
C10K1/16 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1995/32] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND EINRICHTUNG ZUM REINIGEN VON BRENNBAREM GAS | [1995/32] | English: | PROCESS AND ARRANGEMENT FOR SCRUBBING FUEL GAS | [1995/32] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR L'EPURATION DE GAZ COMBUSTIBLE | [1995/32] | Entry into regional phase | 07.02.1995 | National basic fee paid | 07.02.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.02.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.04.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.02.1995 | Examination requested [1995/32] | 28.11.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.12.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.03.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 06.03.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.03.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE1017737 (BASF AG) [A] 1,3,4 * the whole document *; | [A]GB983391 (COAL INDUSTRY PATENTS LTD) [A] 1,3,4 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2235731 (DILLINGER STAHLBAU [DE])[A] 1,3,4; | [DA]DE2701800 (HOELTER HEINZ) [DA] 1-11 * the whole document * |