Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
16.01.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.03.1998 [1998/10] |
24.01.1997 | (Expected) grant | published on 12.03.1997 [1997/11] |
09.01.1997 | Renewal fee | |
12.10.1996 | Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
18.07.1996 | Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
28.06.1996 | First examination report | |
22.06.1996 | Communication of intention to grant | |
07.07.1995 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 23.08.1995 [1995/34] |
07.07.1995 | Request for examination filed | published on 23.08.1995 [1995/34] |