Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9503647 | Global Dossier | 02.02.1995 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9537793 | 23.07.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH08505278 | Global Dossier | 04.06.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | US9309026 | 22.09.1993 | US95060792 | 25.09.1992 | US99619292 | 23.12.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU7372894 | Global Dossier | 20.02.1995 | A | Priority number | Date | US9537793 | 23.07.1993 | US9408381 | 21.07.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU5136993 | Global Dossier | 26.04.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | US9309026 | 22.09.1993 | US95060792 | 25.09.1992 | US99619292 | 23.12.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0662262 | Global Dossier | 18.03.1998 | B1 | EP0662262 | 03.07.1996 | A4 | EP0662262 | 12.07.1995 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9309026 | 22.09.1993 | US95060792 | 25.09.1992 | US99619292 | 23.12.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69317572D1 | 23.04.1998 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US9309026 | 22.09.1993 | US95060792 | 25.09.1992 | US99619292 | 23.12.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5345128 | 06.09.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | US9537793 | 23.07.1993 | US95060792 | 25.09.1992 | US99619292 | 23.12.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5469006 | 21.11.1995 | A | Priority number | Date | US95060792 | 25.09.1992 | US99619292 | 23.12.1992 | US16231393 | 06.12.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5471105 | 28.11.1995 | A | Priority number | Date | US22366894 | 06.04.1994 | US95060792 | 25.09.1992 | US99619292 | 23.12.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5508573 | 16.04.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | US95060792 | 25.09.1992 | US99619292 | 23.12.1992 | US23701694 | 12.04.1994 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5525848 | 11.06.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | US22599894 | 12.04.1994 | US95060792 | 25.09.1992 | US99619292 | 23.12.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9408384 | Global Dossier | 14.04.1994 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US95060792 | 25.09.1992 | US99619292 | 23.12.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1044274C | 21.07.1999 | C | CN1094797 | 09.11.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | US95060792 | 25.09.1992 | US99619292 | 23.12.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5302874 | 12.04.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | US95060792 | 25.09.1992 | US99619292 | 23.12.1992 |