EP0662262 - MAGNETIC BEARING SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.01.1999 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAGNETIC BEARING TECHNOLOGIES, INC. 4030 Braker Lane West, Suite 300 Austin, TX 78759 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/28] | For all designated states MAGNETIC BEARING TECHNOLOGIES, INC. 4030 Braker Lane West, Suite 300 Austin, TX 78759 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PINKERTON, Joseph, F. 6001 Shepherd Mountain Cove, 222 Austin, TX 78730 / US | [1995/28] | Representative(s) | Cross, Rupert Edward Blount, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/28] | Cross, Rupert Edward Blount, et al BOULT, WADE & TENNANT 27 Furnival Street London EC4A 1PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 93922337.6 | 22.09.1993 | [1995/28] | WO1993US09026 | Priority number, date | US19920950607 | 25.09.1992 Original published format: US 950607 | US19920996192 | 23.12.1992 Original published format: US 996192 | [1995/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9408384 | Date: | 14.04.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0662262 | Date: | 12.07.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.04.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0662262 | Date: | 18.03.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.04.1994 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.05.1996 | Classification | IPC: | H02K7/09, F16C39/06 | [1998/12] | CPC: |
F16C32/044 (EP,US);
F16C32/0436 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1995/28] | H02K7/09 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1995/28] | Title | German: | MAGNETISCHES LAGER UND VERFAHREN ZUR MAGNETISCHEN LAGERUNG | [1995/28] | English: | MAGNETIC BEARING SYSTEM AND METHOD | [1995/28] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE CONCERNANT DES PALIERS MAGNETIQUES | [1995/28] | Entry into regional phase | 30.03.1995 | National basic fee paid | 30.03.1995 | Search fee paid | 30.03.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.03.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.04.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed | 30.03.1995 | Examination requested [1995/28] | 07.10.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.04.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.07.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 22.07.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.12.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1997 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   12.01.1998 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 18.03.1998 | ES | 18.03.1998 | FR | 18.03.1998 | IT | 18.03.1998 | LI | 18.03.1998 | NL | 18.03.1998 | SE | 18.06.1998 | DE | 19.06.1998 | [2006/14] |
Former [2003/08] | CH | 18.03.1998 | |
ES | 18.03.1998 | ||
IT | 18.03.1998 | ||
LI | 18.03.1998 | ||
NL | 18.03.1998 | ||
SE | 18.06.1998 | ||
DE | 19.06.1998 | ||
FR | 14.08.1998 | ||
Former [2002/26] | CH | 18.03.1998 | |
ES | 18.03.1998 | ||
IT | 18.03.1998 | ||
LI | 18.03.1998 | ||
SE | 18.06.1998 | ||
DE | 19.06.1998 | ||
FR | 14.08.1998 | ||
Former [1999/42] | CH | 18.03.1998 | |
IT | 18.03.1998 | ||
LI | 18.03.1998 | ||
SE | 18.06.1998 | ||
DE | 19.06.1998 | ||
FR | 14.08.1998 | ||
Former [1999/01] | CH | 18.03.1998 | |
LI | 18.03.1998 | ||
SE | 18.06.1998 | ||
DE | 19.06.1998 | ||
FR | 14.08.1998 | ||
Former [1998/52] | CH | 18.03.1998 | |
LI | 18.03.1998 | ||
SE | 18.06.1998 | ||
FR | 14.08.1998 | ||
Former [1998/45] | CH | 18.03.1998 | |
LI | 18.03.1998 | ||
SE | 18.06.1998 | ||
Former [1998/43] | SE | 18.06.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1513601 (LE GAC) [A] 1-14 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US3470828 (POWELL JAMES R JR, et al) |