EP0670944 - CEILING BOARDING SUPPORT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.10.1997 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.10.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.12.1997 [1997/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PERI GMBH Rudolf-Diesel-Strasse D-89264 Weissenhorn / DE | [1995/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHWÖRER, Arthur Rudolf-Diesel-Strasse D-89264 Weissenhorn / DE | [1996/52] |
Former [1995/37] | 01 /
SCHWÖRER, Arthur, Ing. Rudolf-Diesel-Strasse D-89264 Weissenhorn / DE | Representative(s) | Kohler Schmid Möbus Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Gropiusplatz 10 70563 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/37] | KOHLER SCHMID + PARTNER Patentanwälte Ruppmannstrasse 27 D-70565 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 93922495.2 | 13.10.1993 | [1995/37] | WO1993DE00982 | Priority number, date | DE19924237516 | 06.11.1992 Original published format: DE 4237516 | [1995/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9411594 | Date: | 26.05.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0670944 | Date: | 13.09.1995 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.05.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0670944 | Date: | 27.12.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.05.1994 | Classification | IPC: | E04G11/38, E04G11/50, E04G11/48 | [1995/37] | CPC: |
E04G11/50 (EP,US);
E04G11/38 (EP,US);
E04G11/48 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, IT [1995/37] | Title | German: | DECKENSCHALUNGSTRÄGER | [1995/37] | English: | CEILING BOARDING SUPPORT | [1995/37] | French: | SUPPORT DE COFFRAGE DE PLAFOND | [1995/37] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1996/23: Teilanmeldung 96104314.8 eingereicht am 19/03/96 | EPB 1996/23: Divisional application 96104314.8 filed on 19/03/96 | EPB 1996/23: Demande divisionnaire 96104314.8 déposée le 19/03/96 | Entry into regional phase | 06.06.1995 | National basic fee paid | 06.06.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.06.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.04.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 06.06.1995 | Examination requested [1995/37] | 25.08.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.03.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.05.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.05.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.07.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 11.07.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP96104314.8 / EP0718453 | Opposition(s) | 30.09.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/51] | Request for further processing for: | 19.03.1996 | Request for further processing filed | 19.03.1996 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 03.04.1996 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAY]US776419 (PLATT CHARLES H [US]) [X] 1 * figure -; claim - * [A] 6 [Y] 2-5; | [A]US1907877 (ROOS HENRY W); | [A]US2401587 (CLINTON SMITH WARD) [A] 1-5 * column W *; | [A]US3385557 (RAMBELLE ROBERT D); | [Y]GB1233058 (ECONOMY FORMS CORP.) [Y] 2-5 * page 1, line 74 - page 3, line 5; figure - *; | [A]DE1534852 (ACROW ENG LTD) |