EP0665208 - 4-ALKOXY-2,6-DI-t-BUTYLPHENOL DERIVATIVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.11.1999 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chugai Seiyaku Kabushiki Kaisha 5-1, 5-chome, Ukima Kita-ku Tokyo 115 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/31] | For all designated states Chugai Seiyaku Kabushiki Kaisha 5-1, 5-chome, Ukima Kita-ku Tokyo 115 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAMURA, Kunio, Chugai Seiyaku Kabushiki Kaisha 135, Komakado 1-chome Gotenba-shi, Shizuoka 412 / JP | 02 /
KATO, Yoshiaki, Chugai Seiyaku Kabushiki Kaisha 135, Komakado 1-chome Gotenba-shi, Shizuoka 412 / JP | 03 /
YOSHIDA, Mitsutaka Chugai Seiyaku Kabushiki Kaisha 135, Komakado 1-chome Gotenba-shi, Shizuoka 412 / JP | 04 /
CYNSHI, Osamu, Chugai Seiyaku Kabushiki Kaisha 135, Komakado 1-chome Gotenba-shi, Shizuoka 412 / JP | 05 /
OHBA, Yasuhiro, Chugai Seiyaku Kabushiki Kaisha 135, Komakado 1-chome Gotenba-shi, Shizuoka 412 / JP | [1995/31] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/31] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Postfach 86 07 67 D-81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93922643.7 | 18.10.1993 | [1995/31] | WO1993JP01489 | Priority number, date | JP19920321101 | 16.10.1992 Original published format: JP 32110192 | [1995/31] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9408930 | Date: | 28.04.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0665208 | Date: | 02.08.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.04.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0665208 | Date: | 13.01.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 28.04.1994 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.07.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C07C43/23, C07C43/253, C07C47/277, C07C47/575, C07C69/157, C07D307/79, C07C69/017 | [1995/34] | CPC: |
C07D307/79 (EP,US);
C07C43/23 (EP,US);
C07C47/277 (EP,US);
C07C69/017 (EP,US);
C07D307/94 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1995/31] | C07C43/23, C07C43/253, C07C47/277, C07C47/575, C07C69/157, C07D307/79 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1995/31] | Title | German: | 4-ALKOXY-2,6-DI-t-BUTYLPHENOLDERIVATE | [1998/31] | English: | 4-ALKOXY-2,6-DI-t-BUTYLPHENOL DERIVATIVE | [1995/31] | French: | DERIVE DE 4-ALCOXY-2,6-DI-t-BUTHYLPHENOL | [1995/31] |
Former [1995/31] | 4-ALKOXY-2,6-DI-Z-BUTYLPHENOLDERIVATE | Entry into regional phase | 18.04.1995 | Translation filed | 21.04.1995 | National basic fee paid | 21.04.1995 | Search fee paid | 21.04.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.04.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.03.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 21.04.1995 | Examination requested [1995/31] | 20.05.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.09.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.01.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.06.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.09.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 25.09.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.10.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | |||
Former [2000/12] | DE | 14.04.1999 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]JPH0276869 (TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD); | [A]JPH02121975 (EISAI CO LTD); | [PA]JPH04300878 (FUJIREBIO KK) | [A] - The Journal of Organic Chemistry, Vol. 57, No. 19, September 11, 1992 (11.09.92), JOHN C. GILBERT and MARIAN PINTO, "Development of Novel Phenolic Antioxidants. Synthesis, Structure Determination, and Analysis of Spiro (2,3-Dihydro-5-Hydroxy-4,6,7-Trimethyl-Benz ofuran-2,1'-Cyclopropane)", p. 5271 - p. |