EP0617961 - EOSINOPHIL INFILTRATION INHIBITOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.08.1999 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.09.1999 [1999/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TORAY INDUSTRIES, INC. 2-1, Nihonbashi Muromachi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8666 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1994/40] | For all designated states TORAY INDUSTRIES, INC. 2-1, Nihonbashi-Muromachi 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIBAYAMA, Katsuhiro Toray Shataku 302, 1111, Tebiro Kamakura-shi, Kanagawa 248 / JP | 02 /
HIRAYAMA, Naoki Toray Shataku S102, 1-31-22, Tsunishi Kamakura-shi, Kanagawa 248 / JP | 03 /
KATOU, Testuya 1147-69, Tsu Kamakura-shi, Kanagawa 248 / JP | 04 /
MATSUMOTO, Shu Toray Shataku G2, 1-20-28, Tsunishi Kamakura-shi, Kanagawa 248 / JP | [1994/40] | Representative(s) | Kador & Partner Part mbB Corneliusstraße 15 80469 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/40] | Kador & Partner Corneliusstrasse 15 D-80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93922646.0 | 18.10.1993 | [1994/40] | WO1993JP01492 | Priority number, date | JP19920281653 | 20.10.1992 Original published format: JP 28165392 | [1994/40] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9408581 | Date: | 28.04.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0617961 | Date: | 05.10.1994 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.04.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 28.04.1994 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.02.1995 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/495, A61K31/55, // C07D487/04, C07D519/00 | [1994/40] | CPC: |
C07D487/04 (EP,US);
A61P29/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1994/40] | Title | German: | INHIBITOR DER EOSINOPHILINFILTRATION | [1994/40] | English: | EOSINOPHIL INFILTRATION INHIBITOR | [1994/40] | French: | INHIBITEUR D'INFILTRATION D'EOSINOPHILES | [1994/40] | Entry into regional phase | 30.06.1994 | Translation filed | 30.06.1994 | National basic fee paid | 30.06.1994 | Search fee paid | 30.06.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.06.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.06.1994 | Examination requested [1994/40] | 13.11.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.03.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/38] | 29.04.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1999/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PY]EP0536419 (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP]) [PY] 1-4 * page 3 - page 5 * | [Y] - H.O. HEUER, "Hetrazepinoic antagonists of platelet activating factor.", DRUG DES. DELIV., (1989), vol. 5, no. 1, pages 31 - 47 [Y] 1-4 * abstract * | International search | [A]JPS494478B |