EP0664004 - AN ACCELEROMETER OF THE SHEAR TYPE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.01.1998 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states A/S BRÜEL & KJAER Skodsborgvej 307 2850 Naerum / DK | [N/P] |
Former [1995/30] | For all designated states A/S BRÜEL & KJAER Skodsborgvej 307 DK-2850 Naerum / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STARCK, Lars Smidstrup Strandvej 119 DK-3250 Gilleleje / DK | [1995/30] | Representative(s) | Siiger, Joergen, et al c/o Chas. Hude H.C. Andersens Boulevard 33 1553 Copenhagen V / DK | [N/P] |
Former [1995/30] | Siiger, Joergen, et al c/o Chas. Hude H.C. Andersens Boulevard 33 DK-1553 Copenhagen V / DK | Application number, filing date | 93922900.1 | 07.10.1993 | [1995/30] | WO1993DK00329 | Priority number, date | DK19920001238 | 09.10.1992 Original published format: DK 123892 | [1995/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9409373 | Date: | 28.04.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0664004 | Date: | 26.07.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.04.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0664004 | Date: | 19.03.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 28.04.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G01P15/09 | [1995/30] | CPC: |
G01P15/0915 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1995/30] | Title | German: | BESCHLEUNIGUNGSMESSER MIT SCHERSCHWINGER | [1995/30] | English: | AN ACCELEROMETER OF THE SHEAR TYPE | [1995/30] | French: | ACCELEROMETRE DU TYPE A FORCE DE CISAILLEMENT | [1995/30] | Entry into regional phase | 20.03.1995 | National basic fee paid | 20.03.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.03.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.04.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.03.1995 | Examination requested [1995/30] | 10.07.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.09.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.12.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 10.12.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.12.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 19.03.1997 | ES | 19.03.1997 | IT | 19.03.1997 | NL | 19.03.1997 | SE | 19.06.1997 | [2003/08] |
Former [2002/26] | BE | 19.03.1997 | |
ES | 19.03.1997 | ||
IT | 19.03.1997 | ||
SE | 19.06.1997 | ||
Former [1999/42] | BE | 19.03.1997 | |
IT | 19.03.1997 | ||
SE | 19.06.1997 | ||
Former [1998/11] | BE | 19.03.1997 | |
SE | 19.06.1997 | ||
Former [1997/49] | BE | 19.03.1997 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4180892 (JENSEN JORGEN [DK]); | [A]US4211951 (JENSEN JOERGEN [DK]); | [A]US4941243 (CLEVELAND LESTER G [US]) | [A] - Control and Instrumentation, pages 69-71, Volume 10, No. 10, October 1984, ROBERT BOGUE, "Developing Science of Accelerometers", Fig. "Shear-Mode Design Accelerometer", page 71. |