Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU5176793 | Global Dossier | 09.05.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | EP9302794 | 12.10.1993 | DE4234651 | 14.10.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0664878 | Global Dossier | 11.12.1996 | B1 | EP0664878 | 02.08.1995 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP9302794 | 12.10.1993 | DE4234651 | 14.10.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR9307259 | 25.05.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | EP9302794 | 12.10.1993 | DE4234651 | 14.10.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE59304765D1 | 23.01.1997 | D1 | Priority number | Date | EP9302794 | 12.10.1993 | DE4234651 | 14.10.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9409341 | Global Dossier | 28.04.1994 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE4234651 | 14.10.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2669936B | Global Dossier | 29.10.1997 | B2 | JPH07507874 | 31.08.1995 | A | Priority number | Date | DE4234651 | 14.10.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE146274T | 15.12.1996 | T1 | Priority number | Date | DE4234651 | 14.10.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CZ92895 | 15.11.1995 | A3 | Priority number | Date | DE4234651 | 14.10.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE4234651 | 17.02.1994 | C1 | Priority number | Date | DE4234651 | 14.10.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HU216849 | 28.09.1999 | B | HUT73626 | 28.08.1996 | A | HU9501089D0 | 28.06.1995 | D0 | Priority number | Date | DE4234651 | 14.10.1992 |