EP0664878 - PROCESS FOR DETERMINING A VEHICLE YAW ANGLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.10.1997 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.10.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 10.12.1997 [1997/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mannesmann VDO AG Rüsselsheimer Strasse 22 60326 Frankfurt / DE | [1997/39] |
Former [1996/13] | For all designated states VDO Adolf Schindling AG Rüsselsheimer Strasse 22 D-60326 Frankfurt/Main / DE | ||
Former [1995/31] | For all designated states Mannesmann Kienzle GmbH Heinrich-Hertz-Strasse 45 D-78052 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRULER, Martin Brühlweg 3 D-78554 Aixheim / DE | 02 /
HILGER, Gernot Richard-Koch-Strasse 22 D-78647 Trossingen / DE | [1995/31] | Application number, filing date | 93922932.4 | 12.10.1993 | [1995/31] | WO1993EP02794 | Priority number, date | DE19924234651 | 14.10.1992 Original published format: DE 4234651 | [1995/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9409341 | Date: | 28.04.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0664878 | Date: | 02.08.1995 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.04.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0664878 | Date: | 11.12.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.04.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G01C17/38 | [1995/31] | CPC: |
G01C17/38 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL, PT, SE [1995/31] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ERMITTLUNG DES GIERWINKELS EINES FAHRZEUGES | [1995/31] | English: | PROCESS FOR DETERMINING A VEHICLE YAW ANGLE | [1995/31] | French: | PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE DETERMINER L'ANGLE D'EMBARDEE D'UN VEHICULE | [1995/31] | Entry into regional phase | 13.04.1995 | National basic fee paid | 13.04.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.04.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.04.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.04.1995 | Examination requested [1995/31] | 26.03.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.04.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.05.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 29.05.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.09.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | PT | 11.03.1997 | [1997/50] | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0067338 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1* page 3, line 11 - line 20 *; | [Y]WO8805153 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [Y] 1-4,7-9 * page 7, line 8 - line 27 *; | [Y]EP0451839 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-4,7-9 * page 5, line 51 - page 6, line 3 * * page 6, line 41 - line 46 *; | [DA]DE4111171 (MANNESMANN KIENZLE GMBH) [DA] 1 * abstract *; | [PX]WO9306434 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [PX] 1-4,7,9 * page 3, line 4 - page 4, line 9 * |