EP0663991 - WASTE INCINERATION APPARATUS AND PLANT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.01.1998 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CHANTIER NAVAL GLEHEN PIERRE ET FILS 51, rue Jean-Jaurès 29730 Le Guilvinec / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/30] | For all designated states CHANTIER NAVAL GLEHEN PIERRE ET FILS 51, rue Jean-Jaurès F-29730 Le Guilvinec / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LE GUYADER, Charles Rue du Moulin, Kerhouel F-22290 Lanvollon / FR | [1995/30] | Representative(s) | Le Faou, Daniel, et al Cabinet Regimbeau Espace Performance Bâtiment K 35769 Saint-Gregoire Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1995/30] | Le Faou, Daniel, et al Cabinet Regimbeau 11, rue Franz Heller, Centre d'Affaires Patton B.P. 19107 F-35019 Rennes Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 93922979.5 | 12.10.1993 | [1995/30] | WO1993FR01007 | Priority number, date | FR19920012205 | 13.10.1992 Original published format: FR 9212205 | [1995/30] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9409318 | Date: | 28.04.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0663991 | Date: | 26.07.1995 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.04.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0663991 | Date: | 12.03.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.04.1994 | Classification | IPC: | F23G5/00, F23L17/16, F23J15/00, F23M5/08 | [1995/30] | CPC: |
F23G5/00 (EP);
F23J15/04 (EP);
F23L17/16 (EP);
F23M5/085 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, NL, PT, SE [1995/30] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND ANLAGE ZUR ABFALLVERBRENNUNG | [1995/30] | English: | WASTE INCINERATION APPARATUS AND PLANT | [1995/30] | French: | APPAREIL ET INSTALLATION POUR L'INCINERATION DE DECHETS | [1995/30] | Entry into regional phase | 18.03.1995 | National basic fee paid | 18.03.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.03.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.04.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.03.1995 | Examination requested [1995/30] | 06.12.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.04.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.06.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.09.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.11.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 11.11.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.12.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 12.03.1997 | ES | 12.03.1997 | GB | 12.03.1997 | GR | 12.03.1997 | IT | 12.03.1997 | NL | 12.03.1997 | PT | 12.06.1997 | SE | 12.06.1997 | DE | 13.06.1997 | BE | 31.10.1997 | [2008/05] |
Former [2003/08] | DK | 12.03.1997 | |
ES | 12.03.1997 | ||
GB | 12.03.1997 | ||
GR | 12.03.1997 | ||
IT | 12.03.1997 | ||
NL | 12.03.1997 | ||
PT | 12.06.1997 | ||
SE | 12.06.1997 | ||
DE | 13.06.1997 | ||
BE | 31.10.1997 | ||
Former [2002/26] | DK | 12.03.1997 | |
ES | 12.03.1997 | ||
GB | 12.03.1997 | ||
GR | 12.03.1997 | ||
IT | 12.03.1997 | ||
PT | 12.06.1997 | ||
SE | 12.06.1997 | ||
DE | 13.06.1997 | ||
BE | 31.10.1997 | ||
Former [2000/05] | DK | 12.03.1997 | |
GB | 12.03.1997 | ||
GR | 12.03.1997 | ||
IE | 12.03.1997 | ||
IT | 12.03.1997 | ||
PT | 12.06.1997 | ||
SE | 12.06.1997 | ||
DE | 13.06.1997 | ||
BE | 31.10.1997 | ||
Former [1999/42] | DK | 12.03.1997 | |
GB | 12.03.1997 | ||
IE | 12.03.1997 | ||
IT | 12.03.1997 | ||
PT | 12.06.1997 | ||
SE | 12.06.1997 | ||
DE | 13.06.1997 | ||
BE | 31.10.1997 | ||
Former [1999/16] | DK | 12.03.1997 | |
GB | 12.03.1997 | ||
IE | 12.03.1997 | ||
PT | 12.06.1997 | ||
SE | 12.06.1997 | ||
DE | 13.06.1997 | ||
BE | 31.10.1997 | ||
Former [1998/49] | DK | 12.03.1997 | |
GB | 12.03.1997 | ||
PT | 12.06.1997 | ||
SE | 12.06.1997 | ||
DE | 13.06.1997 | ||
BE | 31.10.1997 | ||
Former [1998/15] | DK | 12.03.1997 | |
GB | 12.03.1997 | ||
PT | 12.06.1997 | ||
SE | 12.06.1997 | ||
DE | 13.06.1997 | ||
Former [1998/11] | GB | 12.03.1997 | |
PT | 12.06.1997 | ||
SE | 12.06.1997 | ||
DE | 13.06.1997 | ||
Former [1998/05] | GB | 12.03.1997 | |
PT | 12.06.1997 | ||
DE | 13.06.1997 | ||
Former [1998/03] | PT | 12.06.1997 | |
DE | 13.06.1997 | ||
Former [1997/43] | DE | 13.06.1997 | Cited in | International search | [YD]US2194490 (ZIMMERMAN) [YD] 1,5 * page 1, column R, line 17 - page 2, column L, line 25 * * page 2, column L, line 54 - page 2, column R, line 27 * * figures 1-3,7,8 *; | [YD]FR1231446 (HOSKINSON) [YD] 1,5 * page 2, column L, paragraph 4 - page 2, column R, paragraph 3 * * page 3, column L, paragraph 4 * * page 5, column L, paragraph 2 * * figures 1-4 *; | [A]FR1170060 (BOSCHER) [A] 1-4 * page 1, column R, paragraph 3 - page 1, column R, paragraph 4; figure . *; | [A]EP0152061 (CAPPI) [A] 1,2,7 * page 9, line 9 - page 10, line 27; figures 7-10 *; | [A]FR1243458 (BLANC) [A] 1,2 * page 1, column R, paragraph L - page 2, column L, paragraph 4; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US2294024 (MC CLINTON) [A] 6 * page 1, column R, line 43 - page 2, column L, line 15; figure 2 *; | [A]US3330231 (SPENCER); | [A]US3525309 (KATZ); | [A]EP0095003 (HEAT EXTRACTOR CORP) | [A] - KISTERS TH. ET HEBBEL H.H., "Emissionsbegrenzung an Abfallverbrennungsanlagen", AUFBEREITUNGSTECHNIK, (197405), vol. 15, no. 5, pages 229 - 233 [A] 7 * page 230, column R, line 8 - page 231, column R, line 9 * * figure 1 * |