Cited in | Search | Type: | Non-patent literature | Publication information: | [X] - Y NAKAGAWA ET AL., "High-performance immobilized metal ion affinity chromatography of peptides; analytical separation of biologically active synthetic peptides", ANALYTICAL BIOCHEMISTRY, NEW YORK US, (1988), vol. 168, pages 75 - 81, XP002040250 [X] 1-8 * the whole document * | DOI: | http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0003-2697(88)90012-7 | Type: | Non-patent literature | Publication information: | [X] - M KASTNER & D NEUBERT, "Highperformance metal chelate affinity chromatography of cytochromes P-450 using Chelating Superose", JOURNAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHY, AMSTERDAM NL, (1991), vol. 587, pages 43 - 54, XP002040251 [X] 1-8 * the whole document * | DOI: | http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0021-9673(91)85196-M | Type: | Non-patent literature | Publication information: | [X] - M BELEW & J PORATH, "Immobilized metal ion affinity chromatography. Effect of solute structure, ligand density and salt concnetation on the retention of peptides", JOURNAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHY, AMSTERDAM NL, (1990), vol. 516, pages 333 - 354, XP002040252 [X] 1-8 * the whole document * | DOI: | http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0021-9673(01)89275-X | Type: | Non-patent literature | Publication information: | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19900409), vol. 112, no. 15, Database accession no. 135398, XP002040253 [X] 1-8 * abstract * | Type: | Non-patent literature | Publication information: | [ ] - T T YIP ET AL., "Evaluation of the interaction of peptides with copper (II), nickel (II), and zinc (II), by high-performance immobilized metal ion affinity", ANALYTICAL BIOCHEMISTRY, NEW YORK US, (1989), vol. 183, no. 1, pages 159 - 171 | Type: | Non-patent literature | Publication information: | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19880314), vol. 108, no. 11, Database accession no. 91168, XP002040254 [X] 1-8 * abstract * | Type: | Non-patent literature | Publication information: | [ ] - E SULKOWSKI, "Immobilized metal ion affinity chromatography of proteins", UCLA SYMP. MOL. CELL. BIOL., NEW SER., (1987), vol. 68, pages 149 - 162 | Type: | Non-patent literature | Publication information: | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19871026), vol. 107, no. 17, Database accession no. 150534, XP002040255 [X] 1-8 * abstract * | Type: | Non-patent literature | Publication information: | [ ] - M BELEW ET AL., "High-performance analytical applications of immobilized metal ion affinity chromatography", ANALYTICAL BIOCHEMISTRY, NEW YORK US, (1987), vol. 164, no. 2, doi:doi:10.1016/0003-2697(87)90519-7, pages 457 - 465, XP024816831 | DOI: | http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0003-2697(87)90519-7 | Cited in | International search | Type: | Non-patent literature | Publication information: | [X] - CELL, Volume 67, issued 04 October 1991, A. ARUFFO et al., "CD62/P-Selectin Recognition of Myeloid and Tumor Cell Sulfatides", pages 35-44. | Type: | Non-patent literature | Publication information: | [X] - CELL, Volume 40, issued January 1985, R. PYTELA et al., "Identification and Isolation of a 140 kd Cell Surface Glycoprotein with Properties Expected of a Fibronectin Receptor", pages 191-198. | Type: | Non-patent literature | Publication information: | [Y] - E. HARLOW et al., "Antibodies: A Laboratory Manual", Published 1988, by COLD SPRING HARBOR PRESS (COLD SPRING HARBOR, NEW YORK), pages 519-527 and 547-552. | Type: | Non-patent literature | Publication information: | [Y] - FEBS LETTERS, Volume 67, Number 1, issued August 1976, J. SJODAHL, "Repetitive Sequences in Protein A from Staphyloccus Aureus: Three Highly Homologous Fc-Binding Domains", pages 62-67. | Type: | Non-patent literature | Publication information: | [Y] - M. WINDHOLZ et al., Eds., "The Merck Index", Published 1976, by MERCK & CO., INC., (RAHWAY, N.J.), page 651. | Type: | Non-patent literature | Publication information: | [Y] - L. STRYER, "Biochemistry", Published 1988, by W.H. FREEMAN AND COMPANY, (NEW YORK), pages 20-21. | Type: | Non-patent literature | Publication information: | [Y] - "Calbiochem Biochemical Catalog", Published 1990-1991, page 127, Item 4015. | Type: | Non-patent literature | Publication information: | [X] - THE JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, Volume 263, Number 18, issued 25 June 1988, Y. SHING, "Heparin-Copper Bioaffinity Chromatography of Fibroblast Growth Factors", pages 9059-9062. | Type: | Non-patent literature | Publication information: | [X] - THE JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, Volume 266, Number 1, issued 25 July 1991, BUSH et al., "Secretion in Yeast", pages 13811-13814. | Type: | Non-patent literature | Publication information: | [X] - BIOCHEMISTRY, Volume 26, Number 15, issued 28 July 1987, ROBBINS et al., "A Covalent Molecular Weight -92 000 Hybrid Plasminogen Activator Derived from Human Plasmin Fibrin-Binding and Tissue Plasminogen Activator Catalytic Domains", pages 4661-4667. | Type: | Non-patent literature | Publication information: | [X] - BIOCHEMISTRY, Volume 28, Number 1, issued 10 January 1989, N. MEDICI et al., "Metal Binding Sites of the Estradiol Receptor from Calf Uterus and Their Possible Role in the Regulation of Receptor Function", pages 212-219. |