EP0663925 - AFFINITY PURIFICATION METHODS INVOLVING AMINO ACID MIMETICS AS ELUTION REAGENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.12.1998 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.12.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.01.1999 [1999/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE GENERAL HOSPITAL CORPORATION 55 Fruit Street Boston, MA 02114 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/30] | For all designated states THE GENERAL HOSPITAL CORPORATION 55 Fruit Street Boston, MA 02114 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SEED, Brian 47A Joy Street Boston, MA 02114 / US | [1995/30] | Representative(s) | Losert, Wolfgang, et al Hoechst AG Patent- und Lizenzabteilung Gebäude K 801 D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/30] | Losert, Wolfgang Dr., et al Hoechst AG Patent- und Lizenzabteilung Gebäude K 801 D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 93923139.5 | 27.09.1993 | [1995/30] | WO1993US09174 | Priority number, date | US19920956660 | 02.10.1992 Original published format: US 956660 | [1995/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9407912 | Date: | 14.04.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0663925 | Date: | 26.07.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.04.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.04.1994 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.10.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C07K3/12, C07K17/14, C07K15/28 | [1997/45] | CPC: |
C07K1/22 (EP);
C07K16/065 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1996/02] | C07K1/00, C07K17/14, C07K15/28 | ||
Former IPC [1995/30] | C07K3/12, C07K17/14, C07K15/28 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1995/30] | Title | German: | AMINOSÄURE-MIMETIKA ALS ELUTIONSREAGENTIEN IN AFFINITÄTSREINIGUNGSMETHODEN | [1995/30] | English: | AFFINITY PURIFICATION METHODS INVOLVING AMINO ACID MIMETICS AS ELUTION REAGENTS | [1995/30] | French: | PROCEDES DE PURIFICATION PAR AFFINITE UTILISANT DES MIMETISMES D'ACIDES AMINES COMME REACTIFS D'ELUTION | [1995/30] | Entry into regional phase | 02.05.1995 | National basic fee paid | 02.05.1995 | Search fee paid | 02.05.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.05.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.03.1995 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 02.05.1995 | Examination requested [1995/30] | 19.12.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.06.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/03] | 14.08.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1999/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - Y NAKAGAWA ET AL., "High-performance immobilized metal ion affinity chromatography of peptides; analytical separation of biologically active synthetic peptides", ANALYTICAL BIOCHEMISTRY, NEW YORK US, (1988), vol. 168, pages 75 - 81, XP002040250 [X] 1-8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0003-2697(88)90012-7 | [X] - M KASTNER & D NEUBERT, "Highperformance metal chelate affinity chromatography of cytochromes P-450 using Chelating Superose", JOURNAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHY, AMSTERDAM NL, (1991), vol. 587, pages 43 - 54, XP002040251 [X] 1-8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0021-9673(91)85196-M | [X] - M BELEW & J PORATH, "Immobilized metal ion affinity chromatography. Effect of solute structure, ligand density and salt concnetation on the retention of peptides", JOURNAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHY, AMSTERDAM NL, (1990), vol. 516, pages 333 - 354, XP002040252 [X] 1-8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0021-9673(01)89275-X | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19900409), vol. 112, no. 15, Database accession no. 135398, XP002040253 [X] 1-8 * abstract * | [ ] - T T YIP ET AL., "Evaluation of the interaction of peptides with copper (II), nickel (II), and zinc (II), by high-performance immobilized metal ion affinity", ANALYTICAL BIOCHEMISTRY, NEW YORK US, (1989), vol. 183, no. 1, pages 159 - 171 | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19880314), vol. 108, no. 11, Database accession no. 91168, XP002040254 [X] 1-8 * abstract * | [ ] - E SULKOWSKI, "Immobilized metal ion affinity chromatography of proteins", UCLA SYMP. MOL. CELL. BIOL., NEW SER., (1987), vol. 68, pages 149 - 162 | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19871026), vol. 107, no. 17, Database accession no. 150534, XP002040255 [X] 1-8 * abstract * | [ ] - M BELEW ET AL., "High-performance analytical applications of immobilized metal ion affinity chromatography", ANALYTICAL BIOCHEMISTRY, NEW YORK US, (1987), vol. 164, no. 2, doi:doi:10.1016/0003-2697(87)90519-7, pages 457 - 465, XP024816831 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0003-2697(87)90519-7 | International search | [X] - CELL, Volume 67, issued 04 October 1991, A. ARUFFO et al., "CD62/P-Selectin Recognition of Myeloid and Tumor Cell Sulfatides", pages 35-44. | [X] - CELL, Volume 40, issued January 1985, R. PYTELA et al., "Identification and Isolation of a 140 kd Cell Surface Glycoprotein with Properties Expected of a Fibronectin Receptor", pages 191-198. | [Y] - E. HARLOW et al., "Antibodies: A Laboratory Manual", Published 1988, by COLD SPRING HARBOR PRESS (COLD SPRING HARBOR, NEW YORK), pages 519-527 and 547-552. | [Y] - FEBS LETTERS, Volume 67, Number 1, issued August 1976, J. SJODAHL, "Repetitive Sequences in Protein A from Staphyloccus Aureus: Three Highly Homologous Fc-Binding Domains", pages 62-67. | [Y] - M. WINDHOLZ et al., Eds., "The Merck Index", Published 1976, by MERCK & CO., INC., (RAHWAY, N.J.), page 651. | [Y] - L. STRYER, "Biochemistry", Published 1988, by W.H. FREEMAN AND COMPANY, (NEW YORK), pages 20-21. | [Y] - "Calbiochem Biochemical Catalog", Published 1990-1991, page 127, Item 4015. | [X] - THE JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, Volume 263, Number 18, issued 25 June 1988, Y. SHING, "Heparin-Copper Bioaffinity Chromatography of Fibroblast Growth Factors", pages 9059-9062. | [X] - THE JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, Volume 266, Number 1, issued 25 July 1991, BUSH et al., "Secretion in Yeast", pages 13811-13814. | [X] - BIOCHEMISTRY, Volume 26, Number 15, issued 28 July 1987, ROBBINS et al., "A Covalent Molecular Weight -92 000 Hybrid Plasminogen Activator Derived from Human Plasmin Fibrin-Binding and Tissue Plasminogen Activator Catalytic Domains", pages 4661-4667. | [X] - BIOCHEMISTRY, Volume 28, Number 1, issued 10 January 1989, N. MEDICI et al., "Metal Binding Sites of the Estradiol Receptor from Calf Uterus and Their Possible Role in the Regulation of Receptor Function", pages 212-219. |