Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH08502313 | Global Dossier | 12.03.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | EP92203256 | 22.10.1992 | EP9302928 | 21.10.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU5336894 | Global Dossier | 09.05.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | EP92203256 | 22.10.1992 | EP9302928 | 21.10.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0665858 | Global Dossier | 21.01.1998 | B1 | EP0665858 | 09.08.1995 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP93923533 | 21.10.1993 | EP92203256 | 22.10.1992 | EP9302928 | 21.10.1993 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69316640T | 07.05.1998 | T2 | DE69316640D1 | 26.02.1998 | D1 | Priority number | Date | EP92203256 | 22.10.1992 | EP9302928 | 21.10.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9409054 | Global Dossier | 28.04.1994 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP92203256 | 22.10.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5378797 | 03.01.1995 | A | Priority number | Date | EP92203256 | 22.10.1992 |