EP0665858 - PROCESS FOR PREPARING ALIPHATIC POLYESTERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.11.1998 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.01.1999 [1999/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 2596 HR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1998/04] | For all designated states SHELL INTERNATIONALE RESEARCH MAATSCHAPPIJ B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 2596 HR Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [1995/32] | For all designated states SHELL INTERNATIONALE RESEARCH MAATSCHAPPIJ B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 NL-2596 HR Den Haag / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MEURS, Jan, Hermen, Hendrik Badhuisweg 3 NL-1031 CM Amsterdam / NL | 02 /
DE JONG, Feike Badhuisweg 3 NL-1031 CM Amsterdam / NL | [1995/32] | Application number, filing date | 93923533.9 | 21.10.1993 | [1995/32] | WO1993EP02928 | Priority number, date | EP19920203256 | 22.10.1992 Original published format: EP 92203256 | [1995/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9409054 | Date: | 28.04.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0665858 | Date: | 09.08.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.04.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0665858 | Date: | 21.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.04.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C08G63/06, C08G63/40 | [1995/32] | CPC: |
C08G63/06 (EP,US);
C08G63/40 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1995/32] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON ALIPHATISCHEN POLYESTERN | [1995/32] | English: | PROCESS FOR PREPARING ALIPHATIC POLYESTERS | [1995/32] | French: | PROCEDE DE PREPARATION DE POLYESTERS ALIPHATIQUES | [1995/32] | Entry into regional phase | 19.04.1995 | National basic fee paid | 19.04.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.04.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.04.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.04.1995 | Examination requested [1995/32] | 12.02.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.03.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.10.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1} | 20.03.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.05.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.07.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 30.07.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Appeal following examination | 30.12.1996 | Appeal received | 30.12.1996 | Statement of grounds filed | 20.03.1997 | Interlocutory revision of appeal | Opposition(s) | 22.10.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DA]EP0287007 (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US]) [DA] 1 * claims 1-10 *; | [A]US2676945 (HIGGINS NORTON A) [A] 9 * claims 1-4 * |