EP0617785 - METHOD AND REGENERATOR FOR REHEATING GASES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.06.2004 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'air Liquide, S.A. à Directoire et Conseil de Surveillance pour l'Etude et l'Exploitation des Procédés Georges Claude 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/17] | For all designated states L'air Liquide, S.A. à Directoire et Conseil de Surveillance pour l'Etude et l'Exploitation des Procédés Georges Claude 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | ||
Former [1994/40] | For all designated states L'AIR LIQUIDE, SOCIETE ANONYME POUR L'ETUDE ET L'EXPLOITATION DES PROCEDES GEORGES CLAUDE 75, Quai d'Orsay F-75321 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FASSBINDER, Hans-Georg Kropfersrichter Strasse 6-8 D-8458 Sulzbach-Rosenberg / DE | [1994/40] | Representative(s) | Vesin, Jacques, et al L'Air Liquide S.A. Service Propriété Industrielle, 75 Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1999/48] | Vesin, Jacques, et al L'AIR LIQUIDE, S.A., Service Propriété Industrielle, 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | ||
Former [1994/40] | Le Moenner, Gabriel, et al Societé l'Air Liquide Chef du Service Brevets et Marques 75, Quai d'Orsay F-75321 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 93923585.9 | 19.10.1993 | [1994/40] | WO1993FR01025 | Priority number, date | DE19924236619 | 29.10.1992 Original published format: DE 4236619 | [1994/40] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9410519 | Date: | 11.05.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0617785 | Date: | 05.10.1994 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.05.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1994/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0617785 | Date: | 13.08.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.05.1994 | Classification | IPC: | F28D17/02 | [1994/40] | CPC: |
F28D17/005 (EP,US);
F28D17/02 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LU, SE [1994/40] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND REGENERATOR FÜR DIE WIEDERAUFHEIZUNG VON GASEN | [1994/40] | English: | METHOD AND REGENERATOR FOR REHEATING GASES | [1994/40] | French: | PROCEDE ET REGENERATEUR POUR LE RECHAUFFAGE DE GAZ | [1994/40] | Entry into regional phase | 10.06.1994 | National basic fee paid | 10.06.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.06.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.06.1994 | Examination requested [1994/40] | 04.10.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.04.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 02.07.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.06.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 09.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.01.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 15.01.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Appeal following examination | 11.03.1998 | Appeal received No. T0654/98 | 17.06.1998 | Statement of grounds filed | 06.06.2000 | Result of appeal procedure: continuation of examination procedure | 06.06.2000 | Date of oral proceedings | 13.06.2000 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Opposition(s) | 14.05.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 17.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 19.10.2003 | [2004/39] | Cited in | International search | [DX]US2272108 (LINN BRADLEY) [DX] 1* column W *; | [X]EP0373450 (KLOECKNER CRA PATENT [DE]) [X] 1,2 * column 6, line 45; figure 1 *; | [X]DE4108744 (APPLIKATIONS- UND TECHNIKZENTRUM) [X] 1-6 * column 2, paragraph 2 * * column 4, line 46 - line 59; figures 1,2 * |