EP0670785 - THERMAL DEMAND PRINTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.04.1999 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.04.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.06.1999 [1999/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zebra Technologies Corporation 333 Corporate Woods Parkway Vernon Hills Illinois 60061 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/50] | For all designated states Zebra Technologies Corporation 333 Corporate Woods Parkway Vernon Hills, Illinois 60061 / US | ||
Former [1995/37] | For all designated states ADAMS, Vincent C. 6 Beechwood Court West Buffalo Grove, IL 60089 / US | ||
For all designated states DONATO, Daniel F. 912 Stratford Mundelein, IL 60060 / US | |||
For all designated states ENSINGER, James W. 1952 Hidden Creek Circle Palatine, IL 60074 / US | |||
For all designated states HAMMAN, William J. 7910 W. 84th Street Justice, IL 60458 / US | |||
For all designated states KAUFMAN, Jeffrey R. 2512 Walnut Waukegan, IL 60087 / US | |||
For all designated states MONNIER, Dan E. 204 E. Hackberry Dr. Arlington Heights, IL 60004 / US | |||
For all designated states NAEGELE, Kenneth V. 249 N. Pontiac Vernon Hills, IL 60061 / US | |||
For all designated states PLATT, Michael K. 1904 Seneca Mt. Prospect, IL 60056 / US | |||
For all designated states POOLE, David L. 1280 Deertrail Lane Libertyville, IL 60048-3404 / US | |||
For all designated states WEST, David A. 283 Whitewood Dr. Streamwood, IL 60107 / US | |||
For all designated states ZUBRISKI, David S. 1444 Bridle Terrace Addison, IL 60101 / US | |||
For all designated states ZWIER, Thomas P. 1131 S. Miller Lane, no. 201 Buffalo Grove, IL 60089 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ADAMS, Vincent C. 205 Hawk Court Schaumburg, Illinois 60193 / US | 02 /
ENSINGER, James W. 1952 Hidden Creek Circle Palatine, IL 60074 / US | 03 /
PLATT, Michael K. 1904 Seneca Mt. Prospect, IL 60056 / US | 04 /
POOLE, David L. 1280 Deertrail Lane Libertyville, IL 60048-3404 / US | [1998/04] |
Former [1998/02] | 01 /
ADAMS, Vincent C. 205 Hawk Court Schaumburg, Illinois 60193 / US | ||
02 /
DONATO, Daniel F. 912 Stratford Mundelein, IL 60060 / US | |||
03 /
ENSINGER, James W. 1952 Hidden Creek Circle Palatine, IL 60074 / US | |||
04 /
HAMMAN, William J. 18478 W Meander Dr. Grayslake, Illinois / US | |||
05 /
KAUFMAN, Jeffrey R. 2512 Walnut Waukegan, IL 60087 / US | |||
06 /
MONNIER, Dan E. 204 E. Hackberry Dr. Arlington Heights, IL 60004 / US | |||
07 /
NAEGELE, Kenneth V. 249 N. Pontiac Vernon Hills, IL 60061 / US | |||
08 /
PLATT, Michael K. 1904 Seneca Mt. Prospect, IL 60056 / US | |||
09 /
POOLE, David L. 1280 Deertrail Lane Libertyville, IL 60048-3404 / US | |||
10 /
WEST, David A. 283 Whitewood Dr. Streamwood, IL 60107 / US | |||
11 /
ZUBRISKI, David S. 1444 Bridle Terrace Addison, IL 60101 / US | |||
12 /
ZWIER, Thomas P. 530 Ramblewood Court Lake Zurich, Illinois 60047 / US | |||
Former [1997/50] | 01 /
ADAMS, Vincent C. 205 Hawk Court Schaumburg, Illinois / US | ||
02 /
DONATO, Daniel F. 912 Stratford Mundelein, IL 60060 / US | |||
03 /
ENSINGER, James W. 1952 Hidden Creek Circle Palatine, IL 60074 / US | |||
04 /
HAMMAN, William J. 18478 W Meander Dr. Grayslake, Illinois / US | |||
05 /
KAUFMAN, Jeffrey R. 2512 Walnut Waukegan, IL 60087 / US | |||
06 /
MONNIER, Dan E. 204 E. Hackberry Dr. Arlington Heights, IL 60004 / US | |||
07 /
NAEGELE, Kenneth V. 249 N. Pontiac Vernon Hills, IL 60061 / US | |||
08 /
PLATT, Michael K. 1904 Seneca Mt. Prospect, IL 60056 / US | |||
09 /
POOLE, David L. 1280 Deertrail Lane Libertyville, IL 60048-3404 / US | |||
10 /
WEST, David A. 283 Whitewood Dr. Streamwood, IL 60107 / US | |||
11 /
ZUBRISKI, David S. 1444 Bridle Terrace Addison, IL 60101 / US | |||
12 /
ZWIER, Thomas P. 530 Ramblewood Court Lake Zurich, Illinois 60047 / US | |||
Former [1995/37] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Long, Edward Anthony, et al Hulse & Co St. James House 2nd Floor Vicar Lane Sheffield S1 2EX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/24] | Long, Edward Anthony, et al Hulse & Co. Eagle Star House, Carver Street Sheffield S1 4FP / GB | ||
Former [1995/37] | Long, Edward Anthony Hulse & Co. Eagle Star House, Carver Street Sheffield S1 4FP / GB | Application number, filing date | 93923748.3 | 30.09.1993 | [1995/37] | WO1993US09327 | Priority number, date | US19920957262 | 02.10.1992 Original published format: US 957262 | [1995/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9407702 | Date: | 14.04.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0670785 | Date: | 13.09.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.04.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0670785 | Date: | 10.06.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.04.1994 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.05.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B41J29/02, B41J29/38 | [1995/37] | CPC: |
B41J2/325 (EP,US);
B41J17/02 (EP,US);
B41J17/24 (EP,US);
B41J17/42 (EP,US);
B41J2/355 (EP,US);
B41J2/365 (EP,US);
B41J25/304 (EP,US);
B41J25/316 (EP,US);
B41J29/02 (EP,US);
B41J29/38 (EP,US);
B65C11/0289 (EP,US);
B65C2210/0027 (EP,US);
B65C2210/0029 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1995/37] | Title | German: | THERMODRUCKER | [1995/37] | English: | THERMAL DEMAND PRINTER | [1995/37] | French: | IMPRIMANTE THERMIQUE | [1995/37] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1997/43: Teilanmeldung 97202416.0 eingereicht am 01/08/97 | EPB 1997/43: Divisional application 97202416.0 filed on 01/08/97 | EPB 1997/43: Demande divisionnaire 97202416.0 déposée le 01/08/97 | Entry into regional phase | 18.04.1995 | National basic fee paid | 18.04.1995 | Search fee paid | 18.04.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.04.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.04.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed | 18.04.1995 | Examination requested [1995/37] | 08.02.1996 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 15.11.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.11.1996 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 05.05.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 22.07.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.09.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.11.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 02.12.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.12.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP00200033.9 / EP1000764 | EP00200053.7 / EP1010537 | EP97202416.0 / EP0811503 | EP97202417.8 / EP0811501 | EP97202418.6 / EP0811500 | Opposition(s) | 11.03.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPS59198175 ; | [X]JPS60192671 ; | [A]JPS63114664 ; | [A]JPS5747671 ; | [A]JPS6357244 ; | [A]DE3226194 (SATO KK [JP]) [A] 18* the whole document *; | [A]US4525084 (IKEDA YOSHIAKI [JP]) [A] 14 * the whole document *; | [Y]US4531700 (ROBINSON CARL W [US]) [Y] 6 * the whole document *; | [A]US4616944 (GALATHA MATTHEW J [US], et al) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [Y]US4685815 (BARANYI SANDOR J [US]) [Y] 16-19 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP0311980 (TOKYO ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 16 * column 7, line 4 - line 50; figure 3 *; | [A]US4832306 (BOSSACK THOMAS J [US]) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [YA]EP0345764 (SATO KK [JP]) [Y] 17,18 * the whole document * [A] 14,15; | [Y]GB2227460 (MONARCH MARKING SYSTEMS INC [US]) [Y] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [XY]EP0388683 (ESSELTE METO INT GMBH [DE]) [X] 14,15,52-62 * the whole document * [Y] 16-19; | [A]US5028155 (SUGIURA IKUZO [JP], et al) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0442726 (OKI ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP0458248 (NCR CO [US]) [Y] 6 * the whole document * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850320), vol. 009, no. 063, Database accession no. (M - 365), & JP59198175 A 19841109 (TOKYO DENKI KK) [Y] 7 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860218), vol. 010, no. 040, Database accession no. (M - 454), & JP60192671 A 19851001 (MATSUSHITA DENSOU KK) [X] 52,53,62 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880926), vol. 012, no. 356, Database accession no. (M - 745), & JP63114664 A 19880519 (NEC CORP) [A] 52-62 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19820703), vol. 006, no. 120, Database accession no. (M - 140), & JP57047671 A 19820318 (RICOH CO LTD) [A] 14,52 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880729), vol. 012, no. 274, Database accession no. (M - 725), & JP63057244 A 19880311 (TOSHIBA CORP;OTHERS: 01) [A] 14,52 * abstract * | International search | [Y]US4027590 (SEIDL MAXIMILIAN R, et al); | [Y]US4768435 (NIMURA HITOSHI [JP], et al); | [A]US4984915 (TASHIRO TAKESHI [JP], et al); | [Y]US5126607 (MERRIMAN JR RICHARD A [US]); | [YP]US5186558 (SHERMAN RICHARD A [US], et al) |