EP0683683 - APPARATUS FOR LIQUID VENTILATION AND CONTROL PROCESS THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1995/48] | PROCESS CONTROL FOR LIQUID VENTILATION | ||
[1999/11] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.11.2000 Database last updated on 10.05.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 22.09.2004 [2004/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Temple University - Of The Commonwealth System of Higher Education Broad Street and Montgomery Avenue Philadelphia, PA 19122 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/48] | For all designated states Temple University of the Commonwealth System of Higher Education Broad Street and Montgomery Avenue Philadelphia PA 19122 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHAFFER, Thomas, H. 159 Bryn Mawr Avenue Lansdown, PA 19050 / US | 02 /
WOLFSON, Marla, R. 806 East Gravers Lane (Wyndmoor) Philadelphia, PA 19118 / US | [1995/48] | Representative(s) | WP Thompson 138 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/48] | W.P. THOMPSON & CO. Eastcheap House Central Approach Letchworth, Hertfordshire SG6 3DS / GB | Application number, filing date | 93923821.8 | 08.10.1993 | [1995/48] | WO1993US09650 | Priority number, date | US19920960611 | 13.10.1992 Original published format: US 960611 | [1995/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9408652 | Date: | 28.04.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0683683 | Date: | 29.11.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.04.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0683683 | Date: | 12.01.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 28.04.1994 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.08.1995 | Classification | IPC: | A61M16/00 | [1995/48] | CPC: |
A61M16/0054 (EP,US);
A61M16/024 (EP,US);
A61M2016/1025 (EP,US);
A61M2202/0476 (EP,US);
Y10S128/913 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1995/48] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR FLÜSSIGKEITSVENTILATION UND REGELUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [1999/11] | English: | APPARATUS FOR LIQUID VENTILATION AND CONTROL PROCESS THEREOF | [1999/11] | French: | APPAREIL DE VENTILATION LIQUIDE ET PROCEDE POUR SA REGULATION | [1999/11] |
Former [1995/48] | VERFAHRENSREGELUNG BEI FLÜSSIGKEITSVENTILATION | ||
Former [1995/48] | PROCESS CONTROL FOR LIQUID VENTILATION | ||
Former [1995/48] | COMMANDE AUTOMATIQUE D'UN PROCEDE DE VENTILATION PAR DES LIQUIDES | Entry into regional phase | 22.03.1995 | National basic fee paid | 22.03.1995 | Search fee paid | 22.03.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.03.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.05.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 22.03.1995 | Examination requested [1995/48] | 05.03.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.07.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.10.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 18.10.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.10.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.01.2000 | BE | 12.01.2000 | CH | 12.01.2000 | ES | 12.01.2000 | GR | 12.01.2000 | LI | 12.01.2000 | NL | 12.01.2000 | SE | 12.01.2000 | DK | 12.04.2000 | PT | 12.04.2000 | LU | 08.10.2000 | IE | 09.10.2000 | [2004/39] |
Former [2004/07] | AT | 12.01.2000 | |
BE | 12.01.2000 | ||
CH | 12.01.2000 | ||
ES | 12.01.2000 | ||
GR | 12.01.2000 | ||
LI | 12.01.2000 | ||
NL | 12.01.2000 | ||
SE | 12.01.2000 | ||
DK | 12.04.2000 | ||
PT | 12.04.2000 | ||
IE | 09.10.2000 | ||
Former [2003/45] | AT | 12.01.2000 | |
BE | 12.01.2000 | ||
CH | 12.01.2000 | ||
ES | 12.01.2000 | ||
LI | 12.01.2000 | ||
NL | 12.01.2000 | ||
SE | 12.01.2000 | ||
DK | 12.04.2000 | ||
PT | 12.04.2000 | ||
IE | 09.10.2000 | ||
Former [2003/08] | AT | 12.01.2000 | |
BE | 12.01.2000 | ||
CH | 12.01.2000 | ||
ES | 12.01.2000 | ||
LI | 12.01.2000 | ||
NL | 12.01.2000 | ||
SE | 12.01.2000 | ||
PT | 12.04.2000 | ||
IE | 09.10.2000 | ||
Former [2002/26] | AT | 12.01.2000 | |
BE | 12.01.2000 | ||
CH | 12.01.2000 | ||
ES | 12.01.2000 | ||
LI | 12.01.2000 | ||
SE | 12.01.2000 | ||
PT | 12.04.2000 | ||
IE | 09.10.2000 | ||
Former [2002/23] | AT | 12.01.2000 | |
BE | 12.01.2000 | ||
CH | 12.01.2000 | ||
LI | 12.01.2000 | ||
SE | 12.01.2000 | ||
PT | 12.04.2000 | ||
IE | 09.10.2000 | ||
Former [2002/17] | AT | 12.01.2000 | |
BE | 12.01.2000 | ||
CH | 12.01.2000 | ||
LI | 12.01.2000 | ||
PT | 12.04.2000 | ||
IE | 09.10.2000 | ||
Former [2001/09] | AT | 12.01.2000 | |
BE | 12.01.2000 | ||
CH | 12.01.2000 | ||
LI | 12.01.2000 | ||
PT | 12.04.2000 | ||
Former [2001/08] | AT | 12.01.2000 | |
BE | 12.01.2000 | ||
CH | 12.01.2000 | ||
LI | 12.01.2000 | ||
Former [2000/52] | CH | 12.01.2000 | |
LI | 12.01.2000 | ||
Former [2000/50] | CH | 17.04.2000 | |
LI | 17.04.2000 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5103814 (MAHER TIMOTHY [US]) [A] 1,3-5,10,12,14-16* abstract * | [A] - SHAFFER ET AL., "physiological effects of ventilation with liquid fluorocarbons at controlled temperature", UNDERSEA BIOMEDICAL RESEARCH, BETHESDA, USA, vol. 11, no. 3, pages 287 - 298 [A] 1,6,11,13,17,22 * page 290 - page 293 * | International search | [Y]US4232665 (VASEEN VESPER A); | [Y]US4889116 (TAUBE JOHN C [US]) | [Y] - IEEE Transactions, Volume BME-22, No. 5, issued September 1975, T.H. SCHAFFER et al., "An Electromechanical Demand Regulated Liquid Breathing System", pages 412-417, especially page 416. |