EP0664857 - INTERENGAGING FASTENER MEMBER AND FASTENER HAVING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.05.1999 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.05.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.06.1999 [1999/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/31] | For all designated states MINNESOTA MINING AND MANUFACTURING COMPANY 3M Center, P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TORIGOE, Shinji 8-1, Chiyoda 2-chome Sagamihara-city, Kanagawa Pref. 229 / JP | 02 /
SUGASAWA, Haruyuki 8-3-602, Minamifujisawa Fujisawa-city, Kanagawa Pref. 251 / JP | [1995/31] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/31] | Hilleringmann, Jochen, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner, Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 (Deichmannhaus) D-50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 93923878.8 | 14.10.1993 | [1995/31] | WO1993US09812 | Priority number, date | JP19920278750 | 16.10.1992 Original published format: JP 27875092 | [1995/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9409279 | Date: | 28.04.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0664857 | Date: | 02.08.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.04.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0664857 | Date: | 08.07.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.04.1994 | Classification | IPC: | F16B5/07, A44B18/00 | [1995/31] | CPC: |
A44B18/0065 (EP,US);
A44B18/00 (KR);
A44B18/0053 (EP,US);
F16B5/07 (EP,US);
Y10T24/2792 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1995/31] | Title | German: | INEINANDERGREIFENDES VERSCHLUSSELEMENTUND VERSCHLUSS MIT SO EINEM ELEMENT | [1995/31] | English: | INTERENGAGING FASTENER MEMBER AND FASTENER HAVING SAME | [1995/31] | French: | ELEMENT D'ATTACHE A EMBOITEMENT ET ATTACHE COMPORTANT LEDIT ELEMENT | [1995/31] | Entry into regional phase | 30.03.1995 | National basic fee paid | 30.03.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.03.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.03.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 30.03.1995 | Examination requested [1995/31] | 03.06.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.12.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.01.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.03.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 18.03.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.04.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3266113 (FLANAGAN JR WILLIAM C) [A] 1 * column 11, line 19 - line 45; figures 12-12B; claim 1 *; | [A]US5138750 (GUNDLACH DOUGLAS P [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 2, line 21 - column 3, line 12; figures 1-5 *; | [A]US4792240 (AUSNIT STEVEN [US]) [A] 1,3,4 * column 4, line 27 - column 6, line 42; figures 1,4,9-13 *; | [A]US3505772 (CLAIRE JAMES H DE, et al) [A] 1,3 * column W *; | [A]WO8908201 (BERGER MICHEL [FR], et al) [A] 1 * figures 1-14; claims 1-3,5,7 *; | [A]EP0323014 (FORD MOTOR CO [GB], et al) |