EP0668882 - PSEUDO NETWORK CONDENSATION POLYMERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.10.2000 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.11.2000 [2000/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOECHST CELANESE CORPORATION 86 Morris Avenue Summit, NJ 07901 / US | [1995/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUPTA, Balaram 54 Glen Court North Plainfield, NJ 07060 / US | 02 /
CHARBONNEAU, Larry, F. 64 Mountainside Road Mendham, NJ 07945 / US | 03 /
HATKE, Wilfried Homburger Strasse 9 D-65719 Hofheim / DE | [1995/35] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/35] | von Kreisler, Alek, Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte, von Kreisler-Selting-Werner, Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 (Deichmannhaus) D-50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 93923928.1 | 19.10.1993 | [1995/35] | WO1993US09949 | Priority number, date | US19920973472 | 09.11.1992 Original published format: US 973472 | [1995/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9411414 | Date: | 26.05.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0668882 | Date: | 30.08.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.05.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0668882 | Date: | 15.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.05.1994 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.08.1995 | Classification | IPC: | C08G61/06, C08F4/643 | [1995/39] | CPC: |
C08G63/20 (EP,US);
C08G63/68 (EP,US);
C08G69/26 (EP,US);
C08G69/32 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1995/35] | C08G63/00 | Designated contracting states | DE [1995/35] | Title | German: | PSEUDO-NETZWERK KONDENSATIONSPOLYMERE | [1995/35] | English: | PSEUDO NETWORK CONDENSATION POLYMERS | [1995/35] | French: | POLYMERES DE CONDENSATION A PSEUDO RETICULATION | [1995/35] | Entry into regional phase | 04.05.1995 | National basic fee paid | 04.05.1995 | Search fee paid | 04.05.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.05.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.06.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 04.05.1995 | Examination requested [1995/35] | 02.04.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.10.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.03.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.06.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.09.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 08.09.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.09.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0249662 (POLYPLASTICS CO [JP]) [X] 1-21 * claims 1-8 *; | [A]EP0444295 (BAYER AG [DE]) [A] * claim 1 *; | [A]US5140093 (GUPTA BALARAM [US], et al) [A] * claim 1 * | International search | [A]US4931534 (PAKULL RALF [DE], et al) | Examination | EP0496257 |