EP0667761 - DISPENSER FOR MEDICAL PREPARATIONS AND INSERT THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.04.1998 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ITEM DEVELOPMENT AB Box 65 S-182 71 Stocksund / SE | [1995/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
THURELL, Peter Törnrosvägen 19 S-182 75 Stocksund / SE | [1995/34] | Representative(s) | Rostovanyi, Peter, et al AWAPATENT AB, Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/34] | Rostovanyi, Peter, et al AWAPATENT AB, Box 5117 S-200 71 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 93924269.9 | 28.10.1993 | [1995/34] | WO1993SE00891 | Priority number, date | SE19920003168 | 28.10.1992 Original published format: SE 9203168 | [1995/34] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9409742 | Date: | 11.05.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0667761 | Date: | 23.08.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.05.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0667761 | Date: | 11.06.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 11.05.1994 | Classification | IPC: | A61J1/03, B65D83/04 | [1995/34] | CPC: |
A61J7/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1995/34] | Title | German: | ABGABEVORRICHTUNG FÜR MEDIZINISCHE PRÄPERATIONEN SOWIE EINSATZ DAFÜR | [1995/34] | English: | DISPENSER FOR MEDICAL PREPARATIONS AND INSERT THEREFOR | [1995/34] | French: | DISTRIBUTEUR POUR PREPARATIONS MEDICALES AVEC PLAQUE INTERCALAIRE ADAPTEE | [1995/34] | Entry into regional phase | 02.03.1995 | Translation filed | 02.03.1995 | National basic fee paid | 02.03.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.03.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.05.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed | 02.03.1995 | Examination requested [1995/34] | 09.05.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.08.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.12.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.03.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 05.03.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.03.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.06.1997 | BE | 11.06.1997 | CH | 11.06.1997 | DK | 11.06.1997 | ES | 11.06.1997 | IT | 11.06.1997 | LI | 11.06.1997 | [2008/05] |
Former [2002/26] | AT | 11.06.1997 | |
BE | 11.06.1997 | ||
CH | 11.06.1997 | ||
DK | 11.06.1997 | ||
ES | 11.06.1997 | ||
IT | 11.06.1997 | ||
LI | 11.06.1997 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 11.06.1997 | |
BE | 11.06.1997 | ||
CH | 11.06.1997 | ||
DK | 11.06.1997 | ||
IT | 11.06.1997 | ||
LI | 11.06.1997 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 11.06.1997 | |
BE | 11.06.1997 | ||
CH | 11.06.1997 | ||
DK | 11.06.1997 | ||
LI | 11.06.1997 | ||
Former [1998/10] | AT | 11.06.1997 | |
BE | 11.06.1997 | ||
CH | 11.06.1997 | ||
LI | 11.06.1997 | ||
Former [1998/04] | AT | 11.06.1997 | |
CH | 11.06.1997 | ||
LI | 11.06.1997 | ||
Former [1998/02] | AT | 11.06.1997 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE1909932 (ORTHO PHARMA CORP); | [A]US4038937 (MOE KJELL); | [A]WO9202202 (SURGICHEM LTD [GB]) |