EP0667973 - COIN SORTERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.11.1997 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.01.1998 [1998/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MCL-BOWEN LIMITED Cumberland Road, Stanmore Middlesex HA7 1EH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/34] | For all designated states MCL-BOWEN LIMITED Cumberland Road Stanmore, Middlesex HA7 1EH / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STEELE, Leonard Marmaduke 4 Weston Road Enfield, Middlesex EN2 0QD / GB | [1995/34] | Representative(s) | Hooper, John Peter Lindesay 5 Haslingfield Road Harlton Cambridge CB3 7ER / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/34] | Hooper, John Peter Lindesay 5 Haslingfield Road Harlton, Cambridge CB3 7ER / GB | Application number, filing date | 93924698.9 | 04.11.1993 | [1995/34] | WO1993GB02273 | Priority number, date | GB19920023355 | 06.11.1992 Original published format: GB 9223355 | [1995/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9411847 | Date: | 26.05.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0667973 | Date: | 23.08.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.05.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0667973 | Date: | 08.01.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.05.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G07D3/14, G07D3/00 | [1995/34] | CPC: |
G07D3/123 (EP);
G07D5/02 (EP);
G07D5/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, DK, ES, FR, IE, NL, SE [1995/34] | Title | German: | MÜNZENSORTIERMASCHINE | [1995/34] | English: | COIN SORTERS | [1995/34] | French: | TRIEUSES DE PIECES DE MONNAIE | [1995/34] | Entry into regional phase | 24.04.1995 | National basic fee paid | 24.04.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.04.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.06.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.04.1995 | Examination requested [1995/34] | 01.03.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 22.04.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 10.05.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.07.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 12.07.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.10.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1995 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   17.01.1996 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAY]EP0209675 (STOCKL) [X] 1 * abstract * * column 4, line 34 - column 5, line 50 * [A] 2-11,16,18,19,22-25 [Y] 2,3; | [Y]GB2198274 (ENTERSWORD LTD) [Y] 2,3 * page 3, line 35 - page 4, line 7 * * claim 1 *; | [A]DE3144327 (ARTHUR) [A] 1 * claim 1 *; | [A]EP0386554 (STANDARDWERK) [A] 1 * claim 1 *; | [A]NL7613883 (GOSTA) [A] 1 * page 2 * |