EP0671051 - DIVISION OF CURRENT BETWEEN DIFFERENT STRANDS OF A SUPERCONDUCTING WINDING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.07.1999 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.07.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.09.1999 [1999/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASEA BROWN BOVERI AB 721 83 Västeras / SE | [1998/37] |
Former [1995/37] | For all designated states ASEA BROWN BOVERI AB S-721 83 Västeras / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BONMANN, Dietrich Wielandstrasse 2 D-6703 Limburgerhof / DE | 02 /
HÖRNFELDT, Sven Götgatan 4 A S-724 62 Västeras / SE | [1995/37] | Representative(s) | Boecker, Joachim Hansmann & Vogeser Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Grosse Eschenheimer Strasse 39 60313 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/37] | Boecker, Joachim, Dr.-Ing. Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Hansmann, Vogeser, Dr. Boecker, Alber, Dr.Strych Adelonstrasse 58 D-65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 93924864.7 | 01.11.1993 | [1995/37] | WO1993SE00910 | Priority number, date | SE19920003592 | 30.11.1992 Original published format: SE 9203592 | [1995/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9412994 | Date: | 09.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0671051 | Date: | 13.09.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.06.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0671051 | Date: | 09.09.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 09.06.1994 | Classification | IPC: | H01F36/00 | [1995/37] | CPC: |
H01F6/065 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1995/37] | Title | German: | STROMVERTEILUNG ZWISCHEN MEHREREN STRÄNGEN EINER SUPRALEITENDEN WICKLUNG | [1995/37] | English: | DIVISION OF CURRENT BETWEEN DIFFERENT STRANDS OF A SUPERCONDUCTING WINDING | [1995/37] | French: | REPARTITION D'UN COURANT ENTRE LES DIFFERENTS BRINS D'UN ENROULEMENT SUPRACONDUCTEUR | [1995/37] | Entry into regional phase | 09.06.1995 | National basic fee paid | 09.06.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.06.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.04.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 09.06.1995 | Examination requested [1995/37] | 06.08.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.12.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.04.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 03.04.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.06.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4447670 (ECKELS PHILLIP W [US]) |