EP0646059 - A METHOD OF TREATING LAMINATED OBJECTS OF PLASTICS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.02.1999 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.2004 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): LU | published on 15.09.2004 [2004/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CRETO (INTERNATIONAL) LTD. c/o Hyab Drytech AB, Hornsgatan 51 S-118 49 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/14] | For all designated states CRETO (INTERNATIONAL) LTD. c/o Hyab Drytech AB, Hornsgatan 51 S-118 49 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CEDERSTRÖM, Rolf Hornsgatan 51 S-118 49 Stockolm / SE | [1995/14] | Representative(s) | Sedvall, Bengt Gustaf Bergenstrahle & Lindvall AB P.O. Box 17704 118 93 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/14] | Sedvall, Bengt Gustaf Brolin & Sedvall Patentbyra AB Box 7182 S-103 88 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 93924892.8 | 09.11.1993 | [1995/14] | WO1993SE00951 | Priority number, date | SE19920003358 | 10.11.1992 Original published format: SE 9203358 | [1995/14] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9411181 | Date: | 26.05.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0646059 | Date: | 05.04.1995 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.05.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1995/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0646059 | Date: | 15.04.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 26.05.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B29C73/34, B63B9/00 | [1995/14] | CPC: |
B29C73/26 (EP,US);
B63B71/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1995/14] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM BEHANDELN VON LAMINIERTEN GEGENSTAENDEN AUS KUNSTSTOFF | [1995/14] | English: | A METHOD OF TREATING LAMINATED OBJECTS OF PLASTICS | [1995/14] | French: | PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT D'OBJETS STRATIFIES EN PLASTIQUE | [1995/14] | Entry into regional phase | 26.05.1994 | Translation filed | 08.08.1994 | National basic fee paid | 08.08.1994 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.08.1994 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.08.1994 | Examination requested [1995/14] | 15.03.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.10.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 27.12.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.07.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.10.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.01.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 09.01.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.01.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/14] | Request for further processing for: | 27.12.1996 | Request for further processing filed | 20.12.1996 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.01.1997 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.04.1998 | BE | 15.04.1998 | CH | 15.04.1998 | LI | 15.04.1998 | DK | 15.07.1998 | PT | 15.07.1998 | SE | 15.07.1998 | IE | 09.11.1998 | LU | 09.11.1998 | [2004/38] |
Former [2003/45] | AT | 15.04.1998 | |
BE | 15.04.1998 | ||
CH | 15.04.1998 | ||
LI | 15.04.1998 | ||
DK | 15.07.1998 | ||
PT | 15.07.1998 | ||
SE | 15.07.1998 | ||
IE | 09.11.1998 | ||
LU | 30.11.1998 | ||
Former [2000/27] | AT | 15.04.1998 | |
BE | 15.04.1998 | ||
CH | 15.04.1998 | ||
LI | 15.04.1998 | ||
PT | 15.07.1998 | ||
SE | 15.07.1998 | ||
IE | 09.11.1998 | ||
LU | 30.11.1998 | ||
Former [2000/07] | AT | 15.04.1998 | |
BE | 15.04.1998 | ||
CH | 15.04.1998 | ||
LI | 15.04.1998 | ||
PT | 15.07.1998 | ||
SE | 15.07.1998 | ||
LU | 30.11.1998 | ||
Former [1999/32] | AT | 15.04.1998 | |
BE | 15.04.1998 | ||
CH | 15.04.1998 | ||
LI | 15.04.1998 | ||
PT | 15.07.1998 | ||
SE | 15.07.1998 | ||
Former [1999/27] | AT | 15.04.1998 | |
BE | 15.04.1998 | ||
CH | 15.04.1998 | ||
LI | 15.04.1998 | ||
SE | 15.07.1998 | ||
Former [1999/01] | AT | 15.04.1998 | |
CH | 15.04.1998 | ||
LI | 15.04.1998 | ||
SE | 15.07.1998 | ||
Former [1998/50] | CH | 15.04.1998 | |
LI | 15.04.1998 | ||
SE | 15.07.1998 | ||
Former [1998/44] | SE | 15.07.1998 | Cited in | International search | [A] - Batnytt, Volume, No. 10, Sept. 1990, CURT GELIN, "Drabbad av Pesten, Ingen Fara - den Gar Att Bota". |