EP0738417 - AIR FILTER AND CIRCULATION SYSTEM FOR A HARD DISK DRIVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.07.1999 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAXTOR CORPORATION 211 River Oaks Parkway San Jose, CA 95134-1708 / US | [1996/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DION, F., Eugene 104 Vivian Longmont, CO 80501 / US | [1996/43] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [1996/43] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 93924939.7 | 14.10.1993 | [1996/43] | WO1993US09857 | Priority number, date | US19920975646 | 13.11.1992 Original published format: US 975646 | [1996/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9411870 | Date: | 26.05.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0738417 | Date: | 23.10.1996 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.05.1994 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1996/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0738417 | Date: | 26.08.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.05.1994 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.03.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G11B33/14 | [1996/43] | CPC: |
G11B33/1446 (EP,US);
G11B33/1453 (EP,US);
G11B33/1486 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1996/43] | Title | German: | LUFTFILTER UND UMLAUFSYSTEM FÜR HARTPLATTENANTRIEB | [1996/43] | English: | AIR FILTER AND CIRCULATION SYSTEM FOR A HARD DISK DRIVE | [1996/43] | French: | FILTRE A AIR ET SYSTEME DE CIRCULATION D'AIR POUR UNITE DE DISQUE DUR | [1996/43] | Entry into regional phase | 12.06.1995 | National basic fee paid | 12.06.1995 | Search fee paid | 12.06.1995 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.06.1995 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.06.1994 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 12.06.1995 | Examination requested [1996/43] | 16.12.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.06.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.03.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.06.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 05.06.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.05.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0427490 (PRAIRIETEK CORP [US]) [X] 1,5 * column 11, line 14 - column 12, line 9; figures 1,2,4,13 *; | [X]EP0458528 (IBM [US]) [X] 1,5 * column 7, line 46 - column 10, line 9; figures 2-7 *; | [X]EP0246756 (MAGNETIC PERIPHERALS INC [US]) [X] 1,5 * column 2, line 28 - line 46; figures 1-4 *; | [X]US5057951 (ECKERD) [X] 1,5,6 * column 3, line 34 - column 4, line 30; figures 2-4 *; | [A]DE3839530 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1,4 * column 3, line 27 - column 5, line 36 *; | [A]GB2198280 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1 * page 5, paragraph 8 - page 7, paragraph 2 * | International search | [XY]US4363057 (SIVERLING MICHAEL M, et al); | [Y]US4863499 (OSENDORF RICHARD J [US]) |