EP0606831 - Fluorinated carboxylic acid esters of phosphono and phosphino carboxylic acids containing an hydroxy and/or mercapto group, process for their preparation and their use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.03.2000 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.03.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.05.2000 [2000/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [1999/19] |
Former [1994/29] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pohmer, Klaus, Dr. Hahnenweg 6 D-51061 Köln / DE | 02 /
Weber, Rainer, Dr. Forststrasse 15A D-51519 Odenthal / DE | 03 /
Block, Hans-Dieter, Dr. Biesenbach 49 D-51381 Leverkusen / DE | 04 /
Moretto, Hans-Heinrich, Dr. Sürderstrasse 50 D-51375 Leverkusen / DE | [1994/29] | Application number, filing date | 94100003.6 | 03.01.1994 | [1994/29] | Priority number, date | DE19934300800 | 14.01.1993 Original published format: DE 4300800 | [1994/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0606831 | Date: | 20.07.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0606831 | Date: | 12.05.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.1994 | Classification | IPC: | C07F9/38, C07F9/30, D06M13/447, C09K3/18 | [1994/29] | CPC: |
D06M13/29 (EP,KR,US);
C07F9/3808 (EP,KR,US);
C07F9/301 (EP,US);
Y02E60/36 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1994/29] | Title | German: | Hydroxy- und/oder mercaptogruppenhaltige fluorierte Carbonsäureester von Phosphono- und Phosphinocarbonsäuren, ein Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung sowie deren Verwendung | [1994/29] | English: | Fluorinated carboxylic acid esters of phosphono and phosphino carboxylic acids containing an hydroxy and/or mercapto group, process for their preparation and their use | [1994/29] | French: | Esters carboxyliques fluorés d'acides phosphono et phosphinocarboxyliques, contenant un groupe hydroxy et/ou mercapto, leur procédé de préparation ainsi que leur utilisation | [1994/29] | Examination procedure | 16.12.1994 | Examination requested [1995/07] | 23.10.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.11.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.02.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 23.02.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.02.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2439281 (HENKEL & CIE GMBH) [A] 1,7 * the whole document *; | [A]DE2424243 (BAYER AG) [A] 1,7 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0238825 (BAYER AG [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document * |