EP0606849 - Surface inspecting apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.04.1997 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.04.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.06.1997 [1997/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. 210 Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa 250-0123 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1994/29] | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. 210 Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi Kanagawa 250-01 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takahashi, Ippei c/o Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd, No. 210 Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa / JP | 02 /
Sano, Shoichi c/o Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd, No. 200 Onakazato Fujinomiya-shi, Shizuoka / JP | 03 /
Kubota, Toshiharu c/o Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd, No. 200 Onakazato Fujinomiya-shi, Shizuoka / JP | [1994/29] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/29] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94100117.4 | 05.01.1994 | [1994/29] | Priority number, date | JP19930002909 | 11.01.1993 Original published format: JP 290993 | [1994/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0606849 | Date: | 20.07.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0606849 | Date: | 06.03.1996 | [1996/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.01.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/89 | [1994/29] | CPC: |
G01N21/89 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, NL [1994/29] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Kontrolle einer Oberfläche | [1994/29] | English: | Surface inspecting apparatus | [1994/29] | French: | Appareil de contrôle de surface | [1994/29] | File destroyed: | 13.09.2003 | Examination procedure | 07.09.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/23] | 09.01.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1997/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 23.10.1996 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1997 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0315697 (NIPPON SHEET GLASS) [A] 1-4,7,9-12,14-20 * page 16, line 23 - page 31, line 15; page 58, line 2 - page 64, line 9; figures * * 3,7-11,33A,33B,34A,35,36 *; | [A]FR2477712 (INTEC) [A] 1-3,7-10,12,14,15,18-20 * page 4, line 2 - page 9, line 16; figures 1-5 *; | [A]EP0069061 (CIBA-GEIGY) [A] 1,2,7,9,11,12,14,18-20 * page 8, line 1 - page 12, line 5; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US4818861 (HORIUCHI H ET AL) [A] 1,4-7,12,13,16-18 * column 2, line 44 - column 4, line 28; figures 1-3 * |