EP0662284 - Process for the preparation of a sterile milk gruel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1995/28] | Process for the preparation of a sterile milk gruel and product obtained | ||
[1998/24] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 11.05.2001 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.05.2001 | Opposition rejected | published on 27.06.2001 [2001/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOCIETE DES PRODUITS NESTLE S.A. Case postale 353 1800 Vevey / CH | [1999/12] |
Former [1995/28] | For all designated states SOCIETE DES PRODUITS NESTLE S.A. Case postale 353 CH-1800 Vevey / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kuehner, Holger Wilhelm-Aetzsoldstrasse 2 D-84453 Muehldorf am Inn / DE | [1995/28] | Representative(s) | Thomas, Alain, et al 55, avenue Nestlé 1800 Vevey / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1995/28] | Thomas, Alain, et al 55, avenue Nestlé CH-1800 Vevey / CH | Application number, filing date | 94100208.1 | 08.01.1994 | [1995/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0662284 | Date: | 12.07.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0662284 | Date: | 24.03.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.06.1994 | Classification | IPC: | A23C9/154, A23C3/037 | [1995/28] | CPC: |
A23C9/154 (EP,US);
A23C3/037 (EP,US);
A23L9/12 (EP,US);
Y10S426/801 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1995/28] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines sterilen Milchbreiprodukts | [1999/11] | English: | Process for the preparation of a sterile milk gruel | [1998/24] | French: | Procédé de préparation d'une bouillie de lait stérile | [1998/24] |
Former [1995/28] | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines sterilen Milchbreis und erhaltenes Produkt | ||
Former [1995/28] | Process for the preparation of a sterile milk gruel and product obtained | ||
Former [1995/28] | Procédé de préparation d'une bouillie de lait stérile et produit obtenu | Examination procedure | 12.01.1996 | Examination requested [1996/11] | 02.05.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.12.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.05.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.09.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 08.09.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
21.12.1999
ADMISSIBLE Hipp & Co Brüningstrasse 141 6072 Sachsein / CH Opponent's representative Jander, Dieter Patentanwalt, Ostpreussendamm 151A 12207 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/07] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
21.12.1999
ADMISSIBLE Hipp & Co Brüningstrasse 141 6072 Sachsein / CH Opponent's representative Jander, Dieter, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt, Ostpreussendamm 151A 12207 Berlin / DE | 27.01.2000 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 17.05.2000 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 23.05.2000 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 02.08.2000 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 23.01.2001 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 02.02.2001 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2001/26] | Request for further processing for: | 06.12.1997 | Request for further processing filed | 08.12.1997 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.01.1998 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS62245 ; | [X]JPH02234644 ; | [X]GB115618 (STEVENS WILLIAM HENRY [US], et al) [X] 12,13 * claims 1-3 *; | [A]FR2173057 (NESTLE SA [CH]) [A] 1,5,7,8,10,11 * page 7, line 6 - line 16; examples 1,3; claims 1-11 *; | [A]FR2349285 (OREGGIA ANGELO [IT]); | [A]FR2559035 (BOGNON PAUL [FR]); | [A] - A. OSTERMANN, "Aseptic packaging of liquid food with particulates", DAIRY PACKAGING NEWSLETTER, (1990), no. 18, pages 1 - 4, XP000605642 [A] 1,3,11 * page 3, column 1 - page 4, column 1; table 1 * | [X] - AN., "New technology for German rice", FOOD MANUFACTURE INTERNATIONAL, (1986), vol. 3, no. 1, pages 38 - 39 [X] 12,13 * page 38, column 1 - page 39, column 2 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (1987), vol. 11, no. 167, Database accession no. (C - 425), & JP62000245 A 00000000 (TSURUMI SEISAKUSHO KK) [X] 12,13 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (1990), vol. 14, no. 548, Database accession no. (C - 785), & JP02234644 A 00000000 (AJINIOMOTO CO INC) [X] 12,13 * abstract * | Examination | EP0601329 | - Milchkundliches Speiselexikon 1981,S 89-91,247-248 und 449 |