EP0607828 - Electromagnetic motor of the stepping type, comprising a cage engaged in a stator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1994/30] | Electromagnetic motor, in particular of the stepping type, comprising a cage engaged in a stator | ||
[1997/48] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.10.1998 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.11.1998 [1998/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eta SA Fabriques d'Ebauches Schild-Rust-Strasse 17 2540 Grenchen / CH | [1997/48] |
Former [1994/30] | For all designated states Eta SA Fabriques d'Ebauches Schild-Rust-Strasse 17 CH-2540 Grenchen / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Perrot, Friedrich Rolliwag 78 CH-2543 Lengnau / CH | 02 /
Diaz, François 27, rue de la Loge CH-2502 Bienne / CH | [1994/30] | Representative(s) | Barbeaux, Bernard, et al ICB Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA Rue des Sors 7 2074 Marin / CH | [1997/24] |
Former [1994/30] | Caron, Gérard, et al ICB Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA Passage Max. Meuron 6 CH-2001 Neuchâtel / CH | Application number, filing date | 94100225.5 | 08.01.1994 | [1994/30] | Priority number, date | CH19930000128 | 18.01.1993 Original published format: CH 12893 | [1994/30] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0607828 | Date: | 27.07.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0607828 | Date: | 26.11.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.02.1994 | Classification | IPC: | H02K37/16, H02K5/128 | [1994/30] | CPC: |
H02K5/08 (EP,US);
H02K37/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1994/30] | Title | German: | Ein elektromagnetischer Motor der schrittweisen Bauart mit einem ständergebundenen Käfig | [1997/48] | English: | Electromagnetic motor of the stepping type, comprising a cage engaged in a stator | [1997/48] | French: | Moteur électromagnétique du type pas à pas, comportant une cage engagée dans un stator | [1997/48] |
Former [1994/30] | Ein ständergebundenen Käfig aufweisender elektromagnetischer Motor, insbesondere der schrittweisen Bauart | ||
Former [1994/30] | Electromagnetic motor, in particular of the stepping type, comprising a cage engaged in a stator | ||
Former [1994/30] | Moteur électromagnétique, notamment du type pas à pas, comportant une cage engagée dans un stator | Examination procedure | 08.08.1994 | Examination requested [1994/40] | 13.12.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.01.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.03.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.09.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.01.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 13.05.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 02.06.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.09.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 12.09.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.08.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1913179 (WARREN HENRY E) [A] 1,6 * page 1, line 40 - page 2, line 15; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US3824684 (WHEELER D) [A] 4,5,7,9,10* column 5, line 42 - column 6, line 60; figures 1-14 *; | [XY]GB2024528 (ASKOLL SRL) [X] 1,3 * page 1, line 84 - page 2, line 53; figures 1-3 * [Y] 2,6,8; | [Y]GB2089137 (FONTAINEMELON HORLOGERIE) [Y] 2,6,8 * page 1, line 51 - line 115; figures 1-4 * |