EP0606912 - CMOS polyphase clock generation circuits [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1994/29] | Polyphase clock generation circuit | ||
[1998/19] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.01.2000 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.01.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.03.2000 [2000/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1994/29] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hiratsuka, Koichi, c/o NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Hikichi, Hiroshi, c/o NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [1994/29] | Representative(s) | Betten, Jürgen Betten & Resch Patentanwälte Postfach 10 02 51 80076 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/29] | Betten, Jürgen, Dipl.-Ing. Betten & Resch Patentanwälte Reichenbachstrasse 19 D-80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94100443.4 | 13.01.1994 | [1994/29] | Priority number, date | JP19930003712 | 13.01.1993 Original published format: JP 371293 | [1994/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0606912 | Date: | 20.07.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0606912 | Date: | 30.11.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0606912 | Date: | 10.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.10.1994 | Classification | IPC: | H03K5/15, H03K19/003 | [1994/49] | CPC: |
H03K5/1508 (EP,US);
G06F1/06 (KR);
H03K5/1515 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1994/29] | H03K5/15 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1994/29] | Title | German: | CMOS Schaltungen zur Erzeugung mehrphasiger Taktsignalen | [1998/19] | English: | CMOS polyphase clock generation circuits | [1998/19] | French: | Circuits de génération d'horloge polyphasés CMOS | [1998/19] |
Former [1994/29] | Schaltung zur Erzeugung eines mehrphasigen Taktes | ||
Former [1994/29] | Polyphase clock generation circuit | ||
Former [1994/29] | Circuit de génération d'horloge polyphasé | Examination procedure | 22.03.1995 | Examination requested [1995/21] | 09.09.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.01.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.07.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.08.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.12.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.06.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.09.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.11.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 30.11.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.12.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0348894 (NEC CORP [JP]) [X] 1,2 * figures 5-7; claim 1 *; | [X]US5111076 (TARNG MIN MING [US]) [X] 1,2 * abstract *; | [Y]DE3740362 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [Y] 3-14 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP0254786 (MONOLITHIC MEMORIES INC [US]) [Y] 3,4,7-10 * figure 5 *; | [Y]EP0463854 (NEC CORP [JP]) [Y] 5,6,11-14 * figure 4 *; | [A]JPS6468016 ; | [A]JPH02124627 ; | [A]JPH03204222 ; | [A]JPS6012818 ; | [A]JPS61156916 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890629), vol. 13, no. 285, Database accession no. (E - 780), & JP01068016 A 00000000 (HITACHI, LTD.) [A] 7-14 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900731), vol. 14, no. 354, Database accession no. (E - 0958), & JP02124627 A 00000000 (NEC CORP) [A] 7-14 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19911204), vol. 15, no. 476, Database accession no. (E - 1140), & JP03204222 A 00000000 (NEC CORP) [A] 7-14 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850531), vol. 9, no. 126, Database accession no. (E - 318), & JP60012818 A 00000000 (HITACHI, LTD.) [A] 15-20 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19861203), vol. 10, no. 359, Database accession no. (E - 460), & JP61156916 A 00000000 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 15-20 * abstract * |