EP0663632 - Method and apparatus for controlling a process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.10.1998 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/50] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [1995/29] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Niemann, Martin, Dipl.-Ing. Rathsberger Strasse 47 D-91054 Erlangen / DE | [1995/29] | Application number, filing date | 94100589.4 | 17.01.1994 | [1995/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0663632 | Date: | 19.07.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0663632 | Date: | 10.12.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.06.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G05B13/04, C23C2/06, C23C2/16, G05D5/03 | [1995/29] | CPC: |
C23C2/14 (EP,KR,US);
G06F15/16 (KR);
C23C2/20 (EP,US);
C23C2/51 (EP,KR,US);
C23C2/525 (EP,KR,US);
G05B13/027 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FR, GB, IT [1995/29] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Führung eines Prozesses | [1995/29] | English: | Method and apparatus for controlling a process | [1995/29] | French: | Méthode et dispositif pour la comande d'un processus | [1995/29] | Examination procedure | 03.01.1995 | Examination requested [1995/29] | 03.07.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.11.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.08.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.01.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.04.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.06.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.08.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 20.08.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.09.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 10.12.1997 | AT | 17.01.1998 | [1999/42] |
Former [1999/34] | AT | 17.01.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0519501 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [Y] 3 * page 7, line 47 - page 8, line 1; figure 13 *; | [Y]EP0521749 (LORRAINE LAMINAGE [FR]) [Y] 11 * page 3, line 14 - page 4, line 50; figures 1-4 *; | [Y] - D. SBARBARO-HOFER, D. NEUMERKEL, K.HUNT, "Neural control of a steel rolling mill", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 1992 INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON INTELLIGENT CONTROL, GLASGOW GB, (19920811), pages 122 - 127 [Y] 1-7,10-12 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0005]; figures 1,10,14,16 * | [Y] - D. NEUMERKEL, F. LOHNERT, "Anwendungsstand Künstlicher Neuronaler Netze in der Automatisierungstechnik", AUTOMATISIERUNGSTECHNISCHE PRAXIS - ATP, MUNCHEN DE, (199211), vol. 34, no. 11, pages 640 - 645 [Y] 1-7,10-12 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0003]; figures 1,5 * | [Y] - T.H. LEE, W.K. TAN, "Real-time parallel adaptive neural network control for nonlinear servomechanisms-an approach using direct adaptive techniques", MECHATRONICS, OXFORD GB, (199312), vol. 3, no. 6, doi:doi:10.1016/0957-4158(93)90059-B, pages 705 - 725, XP000412382 [Y] 6,7,10 * page 712, line 9 - page 713, line 10; figure 5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0957-4158(93)90059-B | [A] - M. BALAZINSKI, E. CZOGALA, T. SADOWSKI, "Modelling of neural controllers with application to the control of a machining process", FUZZY SETS AND SYSTEMS, AMSTERDAM NL, (199306), vol. 56, no. 3, doi:doi:10.1016/0165-0114(93)90206-W, pages 273 - 280, XP000380869 [A] 8,9 * paragraph [02.3] - paragraph [02.4]; figures 1-4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0165-0114(93)90206-W | [A] - H. BERSINI, J.-P. NORDVIK, A. BONARINI, "A simple direct adaptive fuzzy controller derived from its neural equivalent", SECOND IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON FUZZY SYSTEMS, SAN FRANCISCO US, (19930328), pages 345 - 350, XP000371448 [A] 8,9 |