EP0611892 - Collar pivot joint [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.04.1998 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 08.09.2004 [2004/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TRW Fahrwerksysteme GmbH & Co. KG Hansa-Allee 190 40547 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/34] | For all designated states TRW Fahrwerksysteme GmbH & Co. KG Hansa-Allee 190 D-40547 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Henkel, Günther Eckenerstrasse 18 40468 Düsseldorf / DE | 02 /
Salm, Helmut Heidelbeerweg 5 41470 Neuss / DE | [1994/34] | Representative(s) | Brinkmann & Partner Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Am Seestern 8 40547 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/34] | Stenger, Watzke & Ring Patentanwälte Kaiser-Friedrich-Ring 70 D-40547 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 94100696.7 | 19.01.1994 | [1994/34] | Priority number, date | DE19934304775 | 17.02.1993 Original published format: DE 4304775 | [1994/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0611892 | Date: | 24.08.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0611892 | Date: | 11.06.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.06.1994 | Classification | IPC: | F16C11/04 | [1994/34] | CPC: |
F16C11/08 (EP,US);
F16C11/06 (KR);
B62D7/16 (EP,KR,US);
F16C2326/24 (EP,US);
Y10T403/32614 (EP,US);
Y10T403/32721 (EP,US);
Y10T403/32737 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1994/34] | Title | German: | Bundzapfengelenk | [1994/34] | English: | Collar pivot joint | [1994/34] | French: | Palier d'un tourillon muni d'un collet | [1994/34] | Examination procedure | 04.08.1994 | Examination requested [1994/39] | 23.10.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.04.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.11.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 06.12.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 13.12.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.02.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 15.02.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.03.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 11.06.1997 | GB | 19.01.1998 | ES | 20.01.1998 | SE | 20.01.1998 | [2004/37] |
Former [2002/32] | FR | 11.06.1997 | |
GB | 19.01.1998 | ||
SE | 20.01.1998 | ||
Former [1999/02] | GB | 19.01.1998 | |
SE | 20.01.1998 | ||
Former [1998/44] | SE | 20.01.1998 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1510740 (CAM GEARS LTD) [A] 1; | [A]DE3824271 (JOERN GMBH [DE]) [A] 1; | [A]DE4127092 (J¯RN GMBH) [A] 1; | [A]US3130991 (RENATO PIRAGINO) [A] 1,5; | [A]DE4104949 (TOKAI RUBBER IND LTD [JP]) [A] 1,5; | [A]GB1382305 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT) [A] 2 | Examination | US3722931 | GB1475439 |