EP0608820 - Analytical composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.12.2000 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.2010 | Change - representative | published on 14.04.2010 [2010/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KYOTO DAIICHI KAGAKU CO., LTD. 57, Nishiaketa-cho Higashikujo Minami-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto-fu / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1994/31] | For all designated states KYOTO DAIICHI KAGAKU CO., LTD. 57 Nishiaketa-cho Higashikujo Minami-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto-fu / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Satoru, Mizutani, c/o Kyoto Daiichi Kagaku Co. Ltd, Nishiaketa-cho, Higashikujo, Minami-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto-fu / JP | 02 /
Syogo, Yamashita, c/o Kyoto Daiichi Kagaku Co. Ltd, Nishiaketa-cho, Higashikujo, Minami-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto-fu / JP | 03 /
Junji, Yoshioka, c/o Kyoto Daiichi Kagaku Co. Ltd, Nishiaketa-cho, Higashikujo, Minami-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto-fu / JP | [1994/31] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/15] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [1994/31] | von Kreisler, Alek, Dipl.-Chem. Patentanwälte, von Kreisler-Selting-Werner, Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 (Deichmannhaus) D-50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 94101017.5 | 25.01.1994 | [1994/31] | Priority number, date | JP19930011482 | 27.01.1993 Original published format: JP 1148293 | [1994/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0608820 | Date: | 03.08.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/52, G01N31/22, // C12Q1/26, C12Q1/28 | [1994/31] | CPC: |
G01N31/22 (EP);
G01N33/525 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1994/31] | Title | German: | Analytische Zusammensetzung | [1994/31] | English: | Analytical composition | [1994/31] | French: | Composition analytique | [1994/31] | Examination procedure | 24.01.1995 | Examination requested [1995/12] | 10.06.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.10.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/05] | 28.08.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2001/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2000 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO8809824 (NATIONAL DIAGNOSTIC PRODUCTS (AUSTRALIA) PTY. LIMITED) [X] 1-5 * page 4, line 7 - page 5, line 29; claim - * [Y] 4; | [X]WO9101490 (PB DIAGNOSTIC SYSTEMS, INC.) [X] 1-5 * page 4, line 11 - page 5, line 4 *; | [X]DD251002 ; | [X]DD237676 ; | [X]WO9010868 (BADISCHE TABAKMANUFACTEUR ROTH-HÄNDLE GMBH) [X] 1-4 * page 16, line 33- page 17, line 7; page 19, lines 1-14. *; | [X]WO9005914 (PB DIAGNOSTIC SYSTEMS, INC.) [X] 1-3 * page 8, line 28 - page 9, line 30; figure - *; | [Y]WO9212239 (BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM CORPORATION) [Y] 4 * page 7, line 13 - page 7, line 20 *; | [A]EP0264079 (FUJI FILM CO., LTD.) [A] 1-4 * page 5, line 24 - page 7, line 9 * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 88, no. 12, Database accession no. 88-078255, & DD251002 A 19871028 (AKAD WISSENSCHAFT DDR) [X] 1-5 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 86, no. 47, Database accession no. 86-305778, & DD237676 A 19860723 (AKAD WISSENCHAFT DDR) [X] 1-5 * abstract * |