EP0610720 - Festoon-sewing machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.04.2000 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAIER-UNITAS GmbH Nürtinger Strasse 19 D-73257 Köngen / DE | [1994/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Teetz, Wolfgang Gartenstrasse 13-15 D-47647 Kerken / DE | 02 /
Lippert, Dietmar Liechtenstein Strasse 41 D-72124 Pliezhausen / DE | [1994/33] | Representative(s) | Kratzsch, Volkhard Patentanwalt Mülbergerstrasse 65 73728 Esslingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/33] | Kratzsch, Volkhard, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt, Mülbergerstrasse 65 D-73728 Esslingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 94101131.4 | 26.01.1994 | [1994/33] | Priority number, date | DE19934303607 | 09.02.1993 Original published format: DE 4303607 | [1994/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0610720 | Date: | 17.08.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0610720 | Date: | 21.12.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0610720 | Date: | 16.06.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.1994 | Classification | IPC: | D05C7/06, D05B21/00 | [1994/33] | CPC: |
D05C7/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, IT, LI [1994/33] | Title | German: | Festoniermaschine | [1994/33] | English: | Festoon-sewing machine | [1994/33] | French: | Festonneuse | [1994/33] | Examination procedure | 05.04.1995 | Examination requested [1995/24] | 10.12.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.07.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 06.09.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.11.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.01.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 16.01.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.03.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/22] | Request for further processing for: | 01.08.1997 | Request for further processing filed | 01.08.1997 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.09.1997 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 16.06.1999 | CH | 31.01.2000 | LI | 31.01.2000 | [2008/05] |
Former [2002/02] | CH | 31.01.2000 | |
LI | 31.01.2000 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE282022 (FRITZ WEVER) [A] 28 * page 2, line 73 - line 87 *; | [X]FR411199 (HERMANN DROSSNER [FR]) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US1388914 (BARRON WILLIAM L, et al) [A] 28 * column W *; | [A]CH115286 (MISCHKE KARL [CH]) [A] 28-39* the whole document *; | [XA]EP0478872 (TITAN BARATTO S A NV [BE]) [X] 40,41 * claim 1 * * column 2, line 26 - column 3, line 20 * [A] 1-27 |