|
31.01.2005 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
20 |
|
27.01.2005 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.12.2004 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
6 |
|
27.12.2004 |
General authorisation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.12.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
03.12.2004 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
18.11.2004 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.11.2004 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
3 |
|
11.11.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.10.2004 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.10.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.10.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.07.2004 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.06.2004 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.06.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.06.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.06.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.06.2004 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
5 |
|
30.05.2003 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.05.2003 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.05.2003 |
Authorisation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.05.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.04.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
03.02.2003 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.01.2003 |
Request for change of name |
Appeal |
6 |
|
22.01.2003 |
Request for change of name of the applicant |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
17.01.2003 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
3 |
|
09.01.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.01.2003 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.11.2002 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
3 |
|
31.10.2002 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.10.2002 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.06.2002 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.06.2002 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.06.2002 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.06.2002 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.06.2002 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
18.06.2002 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
8 |
|
14.06.2002 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.06.2002 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.06.2002 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
14.06.2002 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.06.2002 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
8 |
|
29.04.2002 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.04.2002 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.04.2002 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.04.2002 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.03.2002 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.02.2002 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.02.2002 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.02.2002 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.02.2002 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.02.2002 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.02.2002 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.02.2002 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.02.2002 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
05.02.2002 |
Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.02.2002 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
10 |
|
05.02.2002 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
05.02.2002 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.02.2002 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
9 |
|
28.08.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.08.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.08.2001 |
Withdrawal of an opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.06.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.06.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.06.2001 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.06.2001 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.06.2001 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.06.2001 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.05.2001 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.05.2001 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.05.2001 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.05.2001 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.05.2001 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.05.2001 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.05.2001 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.05.2001 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.05.2001 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.05.2001 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.05.2001 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.05.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.05.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.05.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.05.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.05.2001 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.05.2001 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.04.2001 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.04.2001 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.04.2001 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.04.2001 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
10.04.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.04.2001 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.03.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.03.2001 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.03.2001 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
9 |
|
09.03.2001 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
21 |
|
09.03.2001 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.03.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.03.2001 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.02.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.02.2001 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.12.2000 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.12.2000 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.12.2000 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.12.2000 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.12.2000 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.11.2000 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.11.2000 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.11.2000 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.11.2000 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.11.2000 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.11.2000 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.11.2000 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.11.2000 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.11.2000 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.11.2000 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.11.2000 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.11.2000 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.11.2000 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.10.2000 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.01.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.01.2000 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.01.2000 |
Description |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.01.2000 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
08.10.1999 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.10.1999 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.10.1999 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.10.1999 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.09.1999 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.09.1999 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.09.1999 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.09.1999 |
N/A |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.09.1999 |
N/A |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.09.1999 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
04.09.1999 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
43 |
|
04.09.1999 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
02.09.1999 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
01.09.1999 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
01.09.1999 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
01.09.1999 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
01.09.1999 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
01.09.1999 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
27.07.1999 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.07.1999 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
21.07.1999 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
21.07.1999 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
21.07.1999 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
21.07.1999 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
22.10.1998 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.07.1998 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.07.1998 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.07.1998 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.06.1998 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
27.05.1998 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.05.1998 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.05.1998 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
13.03.1998 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.09.1997 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.09.1997 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.09.1997 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.09.1997 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
11.07.1997 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.06.1997 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.06.1997 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.04.1995 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the applicant/patent proprietor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.03.1995 |
Request for change of name of the applicant |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.01.1995 |
Written request for examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.09.1994 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.09.1994 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.03.1994 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.03.1994 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
14.03.1994 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
29.01.1994 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.01.1994 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.01.1994 |
Description |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
29.01.1994 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.01.1994 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |