28.12.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.01.2008 [2008/05] |
05.10.2005 |
Change: Appeal number |
|
28.01.2005 |
Revocation of patent |
published on 16.03.2005 [2005/11] |
28.01.2005 |
New entry: Despatch of communication that patent is revoked |
|
25.01.2005 |
New entry: Decision (+date) in appeal procedure |
|
10.01.2005 |
Appeal number |
|
22.12.2004 |
New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
02.06.2004 |
Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
02.06.2004 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
28.11.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.01.2004 [2004/03] |
19.09.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.11.2003 [2003/45] |
30.05.2003 |
Change - representative |
published on 16.07.2003 [2003/29] |
31.01.2003 |
Change - applicant |
published on 19.03.2003 [2003/12] |
09.05.2002 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.06.2002 [2002/26] |
29.04.2002 |
Change - appeal |
|
03.04.2002 |
Change - appeal |
|
31.01.2002 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition |
|
31.01.2002 |
Change - oral proceedings |
|
23.11.2001 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.01.2002 [2002/02] |
23.05.2001 |
Change - oral proceedings |
|
07.05.2001 |
Change - oral proceedings |
|
02.02.2001 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.03.2001 [2001/12] |
23.11.2000 |
Change - oral proceedings |
|
22.03.2000 |
Observations of proprietor on opposition |
|
05.10.1999 |
Observations of proprietor on opposition |
|
10.09.1999 |
Opposition filed |
published on 27.10.1999 [1999/43] |
07.09.1999 |
Unpublished change to opponent data |
|
23.07.1999 |
Opposition filed |
published on 08.09.1999 [1999/36] |
16.10.1998 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 02.12.1998 [1998/49] |
31.07.1998 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
03.06.1998 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
03.06.1998 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
11.05.1998 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
16.01.1998 |
Renewal fee |
|
30.09.1997 |
Examination report or reply |
|
12.09.1997 |
Examination report or reply |
|
12.09.1997 |
First examination report |
|
05.02.1997 |
Renewal fee |
|
29.02.1996 |
Renewal fee |
|
04.04.1995 |
Change - applicant |
published on 24.05.1995 [1995/21] |
20.01.1995 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 08.03.1995 [1995/10] |
22.09.1994 |
Publication of search report |
published on 09.11.1994 [1994/45] |
24.06.1994 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 10.08.1994 [1994/32] |