Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE59407359D1 | 14.01.1999 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE4329282 | 31.08.1993 | DE59407359 | 29.01.1994 | DE4302738 | 01.02.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0609796 | Global Dossier | 02.12.1998 | B1 | EP0609796 | 09.11.1994 | A3 | EP0609796 | 10.08.1994 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE4329282 | 31.08.1993 | DE4302738 | 01.02.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE173915T | 15.12.1998 | T1 | Priority number | Date | DE4329282 | 31.08.1993 | DE4302738 | 01.02.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK0609796T | 16.08.1999 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DE4329282 | 31.08.1993 | DE4302738 | 01.02.1993 |