Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0613633
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
03.09.1999 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 20.10.1999 [1999/42] |
11.09.1998 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 28.10.1998 [1998/44] |
29.05.1998 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
23.04.1998 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
23.04.1998 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
11.02.1998 |
Renewal fee |
|
09.12.1997 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
25.07.1997 |
Examination report or reply |
|
12.04.1997 |
Examination report or reply |
|
25.02.1997 |
Examination report or reply |
|
19.02.1997 |
Renewal fee |
|
18.10.1996 |
First examination report |
|
17.10.1996 |
Examination report or reply |
|
29.02.1996 |
Renewal fee |
|
02.02.1995 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 22.03.1995 [1995/12] |
09.08.1994 |
Publication of search report |
published on 28.09.1994 [1994/39] |
21.07.1994 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 07.09.1994 [1994/36] |