Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0613633 | Global Dossier | 28.10.1998 | B1 | EP0613633 | 28.09.1994 | A3 | EP0613633 | 07.09.1994 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE9302179 | 16.02.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE59407161D1 | 03.12.1998 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE9302179 | 16.02.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE9302179U | 16.06.1994 | U1 | Priority number | Date | DE9302179 | 16.02.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2123068T | 01.01.1999 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DE9302179 | 16.02.1993 |