EP0610805 - Application of neural networks as an aid in medical diagnosis and general anomaly detection [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 28.01.2000 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.2010 | Change - representative | published on 14.04.2010 [2010/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sterling Diagnostic Imaging, Inc. Glasgow Business Community, Blgd. 600, Route 896 Glasgow, DE 19702 / US | [1996/30] |
Former [1994/33] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stafford, Richard Gordon 6 Top of Oaks Chadds Ford, Pennsylvania 19317 / US | 02 /
Mickewich, Daniel James 2005 Millers Road Arden, Delaware 19810 / US | 03 /
Beutel, Jacob 614 Loverville Road, E-1B Hockessin, Delaware 19707 / US | [1994/33] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/15] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [1994/33] | von Kreisler, Alek, Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte, von Kreisler-Selting-Werner, Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 (Deichmannhaus) D-50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 94101600.8 | 03.02.1994 | [1994/33] | Priority number, date | US19930016343 | 11.02.1993 Original published format: US 16343 | [1994/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0610805 | Date: | 17.08.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0610805 | Date: | 07.06.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.04.1995 | Classification | IPC: | G06F15/80, G06F19/00 | [1999/10] | CPC: |
G06T7/0012 (EP,US);
G06F18/2433 (EP,US);
G06N3/045 (EP,US);
G06N3/048 (EP,US);
G06V10/25 (EP,US);
G06V10/764 (EP,US);
G16H15/00 (EP,US);
G16H30/40 (EP,US);
G16H50/20 (EP,US);
G06T2207/30068 (EP,US);
G06V2201/03 (EP,US);
Y10S128/925 (EP,US);
Y10S706/924 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1994/33] | G06F15/42 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB [1994/33] | Title | German: | Anwendung von Neuralnetzwerken als Hilfe für die medizinische Diagnose und allgemeiner Nachweis von Anomalien | [1994/33] | English: | Application of neural networks as an aid in medical diagnosis and general anomaly detection | [1994/33] | French: | Application de réseaux neuronaux pour aider dans le diagnostic médical et détection générale d'anomalies | [1994/33] | Examination procedure | 20.10.1995 | Examination requested [1995/51] | 10.03.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.05.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.09.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 26.11.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 26.11.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.01.2000 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2000/11] | Request for further processing for: | 26.11.1999 | Request for further processing filed | 26.11.1999 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.12.1999 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0336608 (NEUROMEDICAL SYSTEMS INC [US]); | [Y]US4907156 (DOI KUNIO [US], et al) [Y] 1,4-6 * abstract * * column 3, line 15 - line 38 * * column 11, line 40 - line 64 * | [Y] - Egbert D D et al, "Preprocessing of biomedical images for neurocomputer analysis", IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON NEURAL NETWORKS (IEEE CAT. NO.88CH2632-8), SAN DIEGO, CA, USA, 24-27 JULY 1988, 1988, NEW YORK, NY, USA, IEEE, USA, PAGE(S) 561 - 568 VOL.1 [Y] 1,4-6 * page 561, paragraph 3 * * page 563, paragraph 7 - page 565, paragraph 1 * | [A] - Penedo M G et al, "A multilayered neural network for the recognition of lung nodules on digital chest radiographs", COMPUTER ASSISTED RADIOLOGY. PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM. CAR '91 COMPUTER ASSISTED RADIOLOGY, BERLIN, GERMANY, 3-6 JULY 1991, ISBN 3-540-54143-8, 1991, BERLIN, GERMANY, SPRINGER-VERLAG, GERMANY, PAGE(S) 289 - 294 [A] 1,5 * abstract * | [A] - Anthony D et al, "The use of neural networks in classifying lung scintigrams", INNC 90 PARIS. INTERNATIONAL NEURAL NETWORK CONFERENCE, PARIS, FRANCE, 9-13 JULY 1990, ISBN 0-7923-0831-X, 1990, DORDRECHT, NETHERLANDS, KLUWER, NETHERLANDS, PAGE(S) 71 - 74 VOL.1 [A] 1 * page 72, paragraph 2 * | [A] - Harvey R L et al, "A neural network architecture for general image recognition", LINCOLN LABORATORY JOURNAL, SUMMER 1991, USA, VOL. 4, NR. 2, PAGE(S) 189 - 207, ISSN 0896-4130 |