EP0621152 - Drive arrangement for motor vehicles, especially with hybrid drive [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.05.1997 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.07.1997 [1997/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft Petuelring 130 80809 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/36] | For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft 80788 München / DE | ||
Former [1994/43] | For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft Patentabteilung AJ-3 D-80788 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fickenscher, Fritz Connollystrasse 24 D-80809 München / DE | 02 /
Fickel, Hans-Christian Driescher Strasse 26 D-85368 Moosburg / DE | [1994/43] | Application number, filing date | 94101610.7 | 03.02.1994 | [1994/43] | Priority number, date | DE19934311697 | 08.04.1993 Original published format: DE 4311697 | [1994/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0621152 | Date: | 26.10.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0621152 | Date: | 24.07.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.08.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B60K6/10, F16D21/08, F02N11/04 | [1994/43] | CPC: |
B60K6/105 (EP);
B60K6/48 (EP);
B60L3/0023 (EP);
B60L50/16 (EP);
F02N11/04 (EP);
F16D21/02 (EP);
F16D21/08 (EP);
F16D25/087 (EP);
F16D25/10 (EP);
H02K7/006 (EP);
H02K7/10 (EP);
B60K17/02 (EP);
B60Y2400/4242 (EP);
Y02T10/62 (EP);
Y02T10/64 (EP);
Y02T10/7072 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1994/43] | Title | German: | Antriebsanordnung für Kraftfahrzeuge, insbesondere mit Hybridantrieb | [1994/43] | English: | Drive arrangement for motor vehicles, especially with hybrid drive | [1994/43] | French: | Dispositif d'entraînement pour véhicules à moteur, notamment avec propulsion hybride | [1994/43] | Examination procedure | 04.04.1995 | Examination requested [1995/22] | 02.05.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.08.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.01.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.04.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 17.04.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.04.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2078016 (PA MANAGEMENT CONSULT) [A] 1* page 2, line 64 - line 92; figure 1 *; | [DA]DE3243514 (VOLKSWAGENWERK AG [DE], et al) [DA] 1 * figure 1; claims 1,2 * |