EP0667135 - Method of manufacturing a tape tab having a rounded user's end [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.08.1998 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.10.1998 [1998/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/33] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fenske, (NMN) Wilfried Karpfenstrasse 42 D-53902 Bad Münster/Eifel (Hohn) / DE | 02 /
Schmitz, (NMN) Christoph Dr.-Lieser-Strasse 2 D-53881 Euskirchen-Stotzheim / DE | [1995/33] | Representative(s) | Bottema, Johan Jan, et al Procter & Gamble Service GmbH IP Department Sulzbacher Straße 40-50 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/33] | Bottema, Johan Jan, et al Procter & Gamble GmbH Patent Department Sulzbacher Strasse 40-50 D-65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | Application number, filing date | 94101673.5 | 04.02.1994 | [1995/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0667135 | Date: | 16.08.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0667135 | Date: | 22.10.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.07.1994 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/15, B31D1/00, A61F13/58, C09J7/02 | [1995/33] | CPC: |
B31D1/0062 (EP);
A61F13/58 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1995/33] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Klebestreifen mit abgerundeten Enden | [1995/33] | English: | Method of manufacturing a tape tab having a rounded user's end | [1995/33] | French: | Procédé de production de languette adhésive à bout d'utilisateur arrondi | [1995/33] | Examination procedure | 26.08.1995 | Examination requested [1995/43] | 05.02.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.04.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.06.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 27.06.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.07.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0075878 (HARTMANN PAUL AG [DE]) [A] 1 * figure 2B *; | [DA]EP0233704 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US])[DA] 10-12; | [A]EP0292970 (UNI CHARM CORP [JP]) [A] 10-12; | [DA]EP0379850 (MOELNLYCKE AB [SE]) [DA] 1,2,10-12 |