blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0613022

EP0613022 - Airborne weather radar system with aircraft altitude and antenna tilt angle dependent sensitivity time control [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.07.1999
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip09.07.1999No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 25.08.1999 [1999/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AlliedSignal Inc.
101 Columbia Road P.O. Box 2245
Morristown NJ 07962-2245 / US
[N/P]
Former [1995/28]For all designated states
AlliedSignal Inc.
101 Columbia Road, P.O. Box 2245
Morristown, New Jersey 07962-2245 / US
Former [1994/46]For all designated states
AlliedSignal Inc.
101 Columbia Road P.O. Box 2245
Morristown New Jersey 07962-2245 / US
Former [1994/35]For all designated states
AlliedSignal Inc.
101 Columbia Road, P.O. Box 2245
Morristown, New Jersey 07962-2245 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Kuntman, Daryal, c/o Allied Signal Inc.
P.O. Box 2245R
Morristown, New Jersey 07962-2245 / US
[1994/35]
Representative(s)Brock, Peter William, et al
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord 1 Richfield Place Richfield Avenue Reading RG1 8EQ
Berkshire / GB
[N/P]
Former [1994/35]Brock, Peter William, et al
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord 1 Richfield Place Richfield Avenue
Reading RG1 8EQ Berkshire / GB
Application number, filing date94101708.904.02.1994
[1994/35]
Priority number, dateUS1993002351626.02.1993         Original published format: US 23516
[1994/35]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0613022
Date:31.08.1994
Language:EN
[1994/35]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0613022
Date:30.11.1994
Language:EN
[1994/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0613022
Date:02.09.1998
Language:EN
[1998/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.10.1994
ClassificationIPC:G01S13/95, G01S7/34
[1994/35]
CPC:
G01S13/953 (EP,US); G01S7/34 (EP,US); Y02A90/10 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1994/35]
TitleGerman:Wetter-Radarsystem für Luftfahrzeuge mit von der Höhe des Luftfahrzeugs und vom Neigungswinkel der Antenne abhängiger Nahechodämpfung[1994/35]
English:Airborne weather radar system with aircraft altitude and antenna tilt angle dependent sensitivity time control[1994/35]
French:Radar météorologique aérotransporté avec gain variable dans le temps (STC) en fonction de la hauteur de l'avion et de l'angle d'inclinaison de l'antenne[1994/35]
Examination procedure04.01.1995Examination requested  [1995/10]
25.11.1996Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.05.1997Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.01.1998Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
06.03.1998Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.04.1998Fee for grant paid
30.04.1998Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.06.1999No opposition filed within time limit [1999/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.02.1996Renewal fee patent year 03
07.02.1997Renewal fee patent year 04
11.02.1998Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]WO9222831  (WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORP [US]) [A] 1,2,6,7 * page 4, line 4 - page 12, line 29; figure 2 *;
 [A]WO9209903  (KOMATSU MFG CO LTD [JP]) [A] 5,10 * abstract *;
 JPH04190181  [ ] (KOMATSU MFG CO LTD)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.