Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0611662
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
06.02.1998 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 25.03.1998 [1998/13] |
14.02.1997 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 02.04.1997 [1997/14] |
25.01.1997 |
Renewal fee |
|
26.09.1996 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
05.07.1996 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
21.06.1996 |
First examination report |
|
20.06.1996 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
23.01.1996 |
Renewal fee |
|
26.04.1995 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 14.06.1995 [1995/24] |
25.11.1994 |
Publication of search report |
published on 18.01.1995 [1995/03] |
08.07.1994 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 24.08.1994 [1994/34] |