EP0611662 - Thermosensitive recording material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.02.1998 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.02.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.03.1998 [1998/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Agfa-Gevaert AG Kaiser-Wilhelm-Allee 51373 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/34] | For all designated states Agfa-Gevaert AG Kaiser-Wilhelm-Allee D-51373 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Podszun, Wolfgang, Dr. Roggendorfstrasse 55 D-51061 Köln / DE | 02 /
Uytterhoeven, Herman, Dr. Boslaan 6 B-2820 Bonheiden / BE | [1994/34] | Application number, filing date | 94101815.2 | 07.02.1994 | [1994/34] | Priority number, date | DE19934305165 | 19.02.1993 Original published format: DE 4305165 | [1994/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0611662 | Date: | 24.08.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0611662 | Date: | 18.01.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0611662 | Date: | 02.04.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.1994 | Classification | IPC: | B41M5/30 | [1994/34] | CPC: |
B41M5/44 (EP,US);
B41M5/30 (EP,US);
B41M5/3372 (EP,US);
B41M5/3375 (EP,US);
B41M2205/04 (EP,US);
B41M2205/38 (EP,US);
B41M2205/40 (EP,US);
B41M5/41 (EP,US);
Y10S428/913 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1994/34] | Title | German: | Thermoempfindliches Aufzeichnungsmaterial | [1994/34] | English: | Thermosensitive recording material | [1994/34] | French: | Matériau d'enregistrement thermosensible | [1994/34] | Examination procedure | 19.04.1995 | Examination requested [1995/24] | 24.06.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.07.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.09.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 16.09.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.01.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]US3161770 (HUETT GEORGE C, et al) [XD] 1 * siehe Spalte 5, Zeile 55 - Zeile 62; Spalte 5, Zeile 74 - Spalte 6, Zeile 3; Beispiel II, Ansprüche 1, 4 *; | [A]GB2110399 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [A] 1,2,4,7 * page 1, line 48 - line 58; claims 1,7 * * page 2, line 62 - page 3, line 9 ** page 3, line 56 - page 4, line 1 *; | [A]EP0518470 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [A] 1,2,4,6,7 * page 3, line 52 - page 4, line 36 * * page 5, line 24 - line 40; example 1 * |