EP0610856 - Error recovery mechanism for software visible registers in computer systems [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.06.1997 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1994/33] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Date, Yuuki c/o NEC Koufu, Ltd, 1088-3, Ohtsumachi Koufu-shi, Yamanashi / JP | [1994/33] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [1994/33] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 D-81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 94101822.8 | 07.02.1994 | [1994/33] | Priority number, date | JP19930019784 | 08.02.1993 Original published format: JP 1978493 | [1994/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0610856 | Date: | 17.08.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.06.1994 | Classification | IPC: | G06F11/14 | [1994/33] | CPC: |
G06F11/1441 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1994/33] | Title | German: | Fehlerbeseitigungsmechanismus für software-sichtbare Register in Rechnersystemen | [1994/33] | English: | Error recovery mechanism for software visible registers in computer systems | [1994/33] | French: | Mécanisme de redressement d'erreur pour registres visibles par logiciel dans des systèmes d'ordinateur | [1994/33] | Examination procedure | 24.06.1994 | Examination requested [1994/34] | 02.10.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.02.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/33] | 14.03.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1997/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.02.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.1997 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]EP0348652 (IBM) [Y] 1 * column 6, line 40 - line 54 * * column 9, line 50 - column 11, line 14 * * column 14, line 28 - line 54 * * figure 5 * [A] 2; | [Y]EP0212132 (HEWLETT-PACKARD COMPANY) [Y] 1 * page 8, line 4 - page 9, line 17 * * figures 2,3 *; | [A]DE3211256 (SIEMENS) [A] 1 * the whole document * |