EP0610873 - Artifical leather as a border reinforcement for textile constructions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 29.08.1995 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 09.07.2008 [2008/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MEHLER TECHNISCHE TEXTILIEN GmbH Edelzeller Strasse 44 D-36043 Fulda / DE | [1994/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Quell, Hermann Berthostrasse 13 D-36088 Hünfeld / DE | 02 /
Aschenbrücker, Stefan Hünfelder Strasse 22 D-36100 Petersberg / DE | 03 /
Schulz, Günter Stettiner Strasse 4 D-36039 Fulda / DE | [1994/36] |
Former [1994/33] | 01 /
Quell, Hermann Berthostrasse 13 D-36088 Hünfeld / DE | ||
02 /
Aschenbrücker, Stefan Hünfelder Strasse 22 D-36100 Petersberg / DE | |||
03 /
Schulz, Günter Stettiner Strasse 4 D-30826 Fulde / DE | Representative(s) | Fuchs Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 46 60 65036 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/28] | Fuchs Patentanwälte Postfach 46 60 65036 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [1994/33] | Dr. Fuchs, Dr. Luderschmidt Dr. Mehler, Dipl.-Ing. Weiss Patentanwälte Abraham-Lincoln-Strasse 7 D-65189 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 94101852.5 | 08.02.1994 | [1994/33] | Priority number, date | DE19934304079 | 11.02.1993 Original published format: DE 4304079 | [1994/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0610873 | Date: | 17.08.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0610873 | Date: | 14.09.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.07.1994 | Classification | IPC: | D06N3/06, D06N3/18, E04H15/54 | [1994/37] | CPC: |
D06N3/06 (EP);
B32B27/12 (EP);
D06N3/0056 (EP);
D06N7/00 (EP);
E04H15/54 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1994/33] | D06N3/06, D06N3/18 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1994/33] | Title | German: | Ledermaterial für textile Bauten | [1994/33] | English: | Artifical leather as a border reinforcement for textile constructions | [1994/33] | French: | Cuir synthétique pour le renforcement des bordures des constructions textiles | [1994/33] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 13.01.1995 | Examination requested [1995/11] | 22.02.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.08.1995 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1995/42] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE1150044 (FARBWERKE HOECHST AG) [Y] 1-3,6,7 * column 2; example - *; | [Y]DE3025908 (HOECHST AG) [Y] 1-3,6,7 *Seiten 7-8 *; page 3 *; | [A]FR2519904 (HUTCHINSON) [A] 1,3,4 * page 7 - page 8; figure 1 *; | [A]JPS4898200 ; | [A]DE3200824 (HOECHST AG) [A] 1,9 * example 1 *; | [A]DE3208201 (H. VON BLÜCHER) [A] 1,3 * example 1 * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, Database accession no. 74-55711V, & JPS4898200 A 00000000 (TOYOBO) [A] 1,3 * abstract * |