Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5815243 | 29.09.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | US53805895 | 02.10.1995 | US1605593 | 10.02.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2990007B | Global Dossier | 13.12.1999 | B2 | JPH0749571 | 21.02.1995 | A | Priority number | Date | US1605593 | 10.02.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0610889 | Global Dossier | 09.06.1999 | B1 | EP0610889 | 17.08.1994 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US1605593 | 10.02.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69418910T | 09.12.1999 | T2 | DE69418910D1 | 15.07.1999 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US1605593 | 10.02.1993 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5345870 | 13.09.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | US1605593 | 10.02.1993 |